This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 15:26:06 (UTC).

Cox v. CoinMarketCap OpCo LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Cox filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against CoinMarketCap OpCo LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are James A Teilborg and Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08197

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James A Teilborg

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Cox

Defendants

CoinMarketCap OpCo LLC

Binance Capital Management Company Limited doing business as Binance doing business as Binance.com

BAM Trading Services Incorporated doing business as Binance.US

Changpeng Zhao

Catherine Coley

Yi He

Ted Lin

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Wentz, Jr.

414 Church St., Ste. 308

Sandpoint, ID 83864

Alexander Michael Kolodin

Attorney at Davillier Law Group LLC - Phoenix, AZ

3443 N Central Ave., Ste. 1009

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Christopher Alfredo Viskovic

Attorney at Davillier Law Group LLC - Phoenix, AZ

3443 N Central Ave., Ste. 1009

Phoenix, AZ 85012

George R Wentz, Jr.

Attorney at Davillier Law Group LLC

414 Church St., Ste. 308

Sandpoint, ID 83864

Arno Tedford Naeckel, Jr.

Attorney at Devillier Law Group - Phoenix, AZ

3443 N Central Ave., Ste. 1009

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Prugh Roeser

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - New York, NY

New York Times Bldg.620 8Th Ave.

New York, NY 10018-1405

Ezekiel L Hill

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP - Washington, DC

1900 N St. Nw.

Washington, DC 20036-1612

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAM Trading Services Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent BAM Management US Holdings, Inc. for BAM Trading Services Incorporated. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order Proposed order for Social Media Service

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Errata re: #24 First MOTION for Alternative Service via Social Media against Ted Lin, Yi He, and Changpeng Zhao Submitted by Plaintiff Ryan Cox.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order for Social Media Service)(Naeckel, Arno) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

24 #3

Proposed Order for alternative service by social media

24 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

24 #1

Exhibit Investigation Report

#24

(#24) EX PARTE First MOTION for Alternative Service via Social Media against Ted Lin, Yi He, and Changpeng Zhao by Ryan Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Investigation Report, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Proposed Order for alternative service by social media)(Naeckel, Arno) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Arno Tedford Naeckel, Jr on behalf of Ryan Cox. (Naeckel, Arno) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#22

(#22) Summons Issued as to Catherine Coley, Yi He, Ted Lin, Changpeng Zhao. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#8

7 #1

Summons BAM Summons

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAM Trading Services Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent BAM Management US Holdings, Inc. for BAM Trading Services Incorporated. (Roeser, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Errata re: #24 First MOTION for Alternative Service via Social Media against Ted Lin, Yi He, and Changpeng Zhao Submitted by Plaintiff Ryan Cox.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order for Social Media Service)(Naeckel, Arno) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) EX PARTE First MOTION for Alternative Service via Social Media against Ted Lin, Yi He, and Changpeng Zhao by Ryan Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Investigation Report, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Proposed Order for alternative service by social media)(Naeckel, Arno) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Arno Tedford Naeckel, Jr on behalf of Ryan Cox. (Naeckel, Arno) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Summons Issued as to Catherine Coley, Yi He, Ted Lin, Changpeng Zhao. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Cox. (Kolodin, Alexander) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Cox. (Kolodin, Alexander) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Cox. (Kolodin, Alexander) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Cox. (Kolodin, Alexander) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER pursuant to #16 Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, The deadline for the Corporate Defendants to respond to the complaint filed by Plaintiff on 9/13/2021, shall be sixty (60) days after the date that service of the Complaint upon all of defendants Changpeng Zhao, Catherine Coley, Yi He, and Ted Lin has been perfected; Should any of the Corporate Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiff shall file his opposition(s) to the motion(s) to dismiss within sixty (60) days of the filing of the motion(s) to dismiss; and the Corporate Defendants shall file reply brief(s) within thirty (30) days of the filing of Plaintiff's opposition(s); The Corporate Defendants do not waive any of their respective rights and defenses, including, without limitation, any and all jurisdictional, venue, or forum-related rights and defenses, by agreeing to and/or filing the Joint Stipulation for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 11/05/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Summons Submitted filed by Ryan Cox. Summons submitted for BAM Trading Services Incorporated not issued - defendant name on summons does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to CoinMarketCap OpCo LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Cox. (Attachments: #1 Summons BAM Summons)(Kolodin, Alexander) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for George R Wentz, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Cox. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/16/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/16/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/16/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER -IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich, United States District Judge. All further pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-21-8197-PCT-SMB. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/15/2021. (LAD) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19858818. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08197-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19858818 filed by Ryan Cox. (Kolodin, Alexander) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAM Trading Services Inc. doing business as Binance.US is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Prugh Roeser Esquire