This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:05:13 (UTC).

Cox v. Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Cox filed an Other lawsuit against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Herman N Johnson, Jr and Liles C Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00577

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Herman N Johnson, Jr

Liles C Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Cox

Defendants

Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc

Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian Michael Berry

Attorney at MOORE, BERRY & LINVILLE

P.O. Box 9

Florence, AL 35631

Larry B Moore

Attorney at MOORE BERRY & LINVILLE

211 North Court Street, P O Box 9

Florence, AL 35631

Kimberly Elam Linville

Attorney at MOORE, BERRY & LINVILLE

211 North Court Street

Florence, AL 35631

Robert E Morelli

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Michael L Weinman

Attorney at WEINMAN AND ASSOCIATES

P.O. Box 266

Jackson, TN 38302

Paula R Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

J Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Gordon E Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Memphis, TN 38018

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Puma

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Vishal H Shah

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Lauren E Marzullo

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Oxford Centre, 32Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

David B Block

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801-4936

David R Beasley

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

655 Gallatin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) NOTICE by Kenneth Cox Consents to Join Dawn Creswell and Michael Perdue (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#41

(#41) PROTECTIVE ORDER that certain documents and information shall remain confidential as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/8/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#39

(#39) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Block, David) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

38 #1

Exhibit Agreed Joint Protective Order

#38

(#38) AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Joint Protective Order)(Block, David) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#37

(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Kenneth Cox. (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#36

(#36) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Block, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#33

(#35) TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/5/2019. (KBW) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#28

(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Kenneth Cox. (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#7

(#8) ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Limited Admission and granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission for Michael L. Weinman to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/2/19. (BJL) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019; Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#8) ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Limited Admission and granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission for Michael L. Weinman to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/2/19. (BJL) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Kenneth Cox. (Linville, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3324619 (B4601096866). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJL). (Linville, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE by Kenneth Cox Consents to Join Dawn Creswell and Michael Perdue (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) PROTECTIVE ORDER that certain documents and information shall remain confidential as set out in this order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/8/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/27/2019. (KBW) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC. (Block, David) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Joint Protective Order)(Block, David) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike filed by Kenneth Cox. (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Block, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3361679. (B4601098189) (Block, David) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3361672.(B4601098190) (Block, David) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/5/2019. (KBW) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Limited Admission and granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission for Michael L. Weinman to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/2/19. (BJL) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended MOTION for Limited Admission of Michael L. Weinman Motion is RIPE 5/2/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Linville, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019; Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3331474 (receipt number B4601097041). (Linville, Kimberly) Modified on 4/29/2019 (BJL). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Limited Admission of Michael L. Weinman Motion is RIPE 4/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Linville, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Kenneth Cox. (Linville, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3324619 (B4601096866). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BJL). (Linville, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution LLC filed by Kenneth Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Puma