This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2021 at 05:53:28 (UTC).

Cox et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Cox filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Gilead Sciences, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-06807

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACQUELINE C. COX

BERNETTE MELVIN

DAVID HASTON SNOW

EDWARD MCKEITHAN

ERNSHILDA D. WILSON

FELICIA MCILWAIN

JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS

JERRY L. WINGATE

JOE OVERCASH

JOHN DOE 26

LINDA R. BUONAIUTO

MICHAEL D. ARTUSO

PAMELA ANN SLOAN

PATRICIA A. TURNER

PIERRE SMITH

REGINA WILSON

WESLEY H. WILLIAMS

Defendant

Gilead Sciences Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emily Jeanette Beeson

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP

719 S Shoreline

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

AMANDA P. NITTO

Attorney at ROBINSON BRADSHAW & HINSON, P.A.

101 N. Tryon St., Ste. 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246-1900

STEPHEN DANIEL FELDMAN

Attorney at ROBINSON, BRADSHAW & HINSON, P.A.

434 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1600

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-00481. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/1/2021; that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk shall take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/26/2021; that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #9 ] is GRANTED and Gilead's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to September 22, 2021. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by MICHAEL D. ARTUSO, LINDA R. BUONAIUTO, JACQUELINE C. COX, JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS, JOHN DOE 26, FELICIA MCILWAIN, EDWARD MCKEITHAN, BERNETTE MELVIN, JOE OVERCASH, PAMELA ANN SLOAN, PIERRE SMITH, DAVID HASTON SNOW, PATRICIA A. TURNER, WESLEY H. WILLIAMS, ERNSHILDA D. WILSON, REGINA WILSON, JERRY L. WINGATE. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021 (BEESON, EMILY) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, [Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint] by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney AMANDA P. NITTO on behalf of Defendant GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (NITTO, AMANDA) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHEN DANIEL FELDMAN on behalf of Defendant GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Notice Letter

#1

(#9) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, [Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint] by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:21-cv-00481. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/1/2021; that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk shall take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/26/2021; that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #9 ] is GRANTED and Gilead's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to September 22, 2021. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #10 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Brief in Support re #10 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California filed by MICHAEL D. ARTUSO, LINDA R. BUONAIUTO, JACQUELINE C. COX, JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS, JOHN DOE 26, FELICIA MCILWAIN, EDWARD MCKEITHAN, BERNETTE MELVIN, JOE OVERCASH, PAMELA ANN SLOAN, PIERRE SMITH, DAVID HASTON SNOW, PATRICIA A. TURNER, WESLEY H. WILLIAMS, ERNSHILDA D. WILSON, REGINA WILSON, JERRY L. WINGATE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BEESON, EMILY) Modified on 8/21/2021 to correct name of document. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by MICHAEL D. ARTUSO, LINDA R. BUONAIUTO, JACQUELINE C. COX, JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS, JOHN DOE 26, FELICIA MCILWAIN, EDWARD MCKEITHAN, BERNETTE MELVIN, JOE OVERCASH, PAMELA ANN SLOAN, PIERRE SMITH, DAVID HASTON SNOW, PATRICIA A. TURNER, WESLEY H. WILLIAMS, ERNSHILDA D. WILSON, REGINA WILSON, JERRY L. WINGATE. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021 (BEESON, EMILY) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, [Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint]. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, [Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint] by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.'S CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/9/2021; that the Motion [Doc. #7 ] is GRANTED. Gilead's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 23, 2021. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Williamson, Wanda) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney AMANDA P. NITTO on behalf of Defendant GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (NITTO, AMANDA) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney STEPHEN DANIEL FELDMAN on behalf of Defendant GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (FELDMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3066820.), filed by LINDA R. BUONAIUTO, JACQUELINE ROCHELLE DAVIS, WESLEY H. WILLIAMS, BERNETTE MELVIN, JACQUELINE C. COX, REGINA WILSON, PAMELA ANN SLOAN, FELICIA MCILWAIN, DAVID HASTON SNOW, JOE OVERCASH, MICHAEL D. ARTUSO, PIERRE SMITH, PATRICIA A. TURNER, JERRY L. WINGATE, EDWARD MCKEITHAN, JOHN 26 DOE, ERNSHILDA D. WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEESON, EMILY) (Entered: 06/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda P. Nitto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen D. Feldman