This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2021 at 06:59:23 (UTC).

Cox Communications, Inc. v. BMG Rights Management US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Cox Communications, Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BMG Rights Management US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick, Dale S. Fischer and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03756

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judges

Charles F. Eick

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cox Communications, Inc.

Defendants

Rightscorp, Inc.

BMG Rights Management (US) LLC

BMG Rights Management US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer A Golinveaux

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5840

Michael S. Elkin

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Thomas James Kearney

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California Street 39Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5802

Defendant Attorney

John William Toth

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dd) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-03756 DSF(KKx). (rn) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #16 , by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The last day for Defendants to file a response to the Complaint is extended from July 13, 2021 until and including July 27, 2021. (es) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BMG Rights Management US LLC answer now due 7/27/2021; Rightscorp, Inc. answer now due 7/27/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants BMG Rights Management US LLC; Rightscorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toth, John) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:The last day for Defendants to file a response to the Complaint is extended from June 22, 2021 until and including July 13, 2021. (vmun) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BMG Rights Management US LLC answer now due 7/13/2021; Rightscorp, Inc. answer now due 7/13/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants BMG Rights Management US LLC; Rightscorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney John William Toth added to party BMG Rights Management US LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John William Toth added to party Rightscorp, Inc.(pty:dft))(Toth, John) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BMG Rights Management US LLC, Rightscorp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendnat Rightscorp Inc)(et) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31273920) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.2(a) Applicant resides in California. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): See Declaration attached. (lt) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: Denying #9 Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Elkin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc.. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the pro hac vice application fee, if paid, be refunded. Terming Attorney Michael S. Elkin. (es) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Elkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31273920) filed by Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Elkin, #2 Proposed Order) (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (See document for details) (vmun) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRECTED NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Elkin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error G109 Notice was issued with the incorrect filed date. Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) Notice, #5 should be disregarded. A Corrected G109 Notice will be docketed. (car) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 5/4/2021, SEE ITEM 6] NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Elkin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) Modified on 5/4/2021 (car). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Interested Parties and Rule 7.1 Statement of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc., identifying Cox DNS, Inc. and Cox Enterprises, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 05/03/2021, receipt number ACACDC-31228783), filed by Plaintiff Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer A Golinveaux added to party Cox Communications, Inc.(pty:pla))(Golinveaux, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rightscorp Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where COX COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant