This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2021 at 08:34:17 (UTC).

COWEY et al v. MULLEN et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2020 COWEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MULLEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christy Criswell Wiegand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01845

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christy Criswell Wiegand

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.

EMILY COWEY

CHELSEA SCHMIDT

ALAN BOOTH

Defendants

COL. ROBERT EVANCHICK

SHERIFF WILLIAM MULLEN

COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Kraut

Attorney at Firearms Policy Coalition

1215 K Street, 17Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Joshua Prince

Attorney at Prince Law Offices, P.C.

646 Lenape Rd

Bechtelsville, PA 19505

Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I

Attorney at The DiGuiseppe Law Firm, P.C.

Post Office Box 10790

Southport, NC 28461

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Moniak

Attorney at PA Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor, Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17112

Lisa G. Michel

Attorney at Allegheny County Sheriff's Office

436 Grant Street, Room 111

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Virginia Spencer Scott

Attorney at Allegheny County Department of Law

300 Fort Pitt Commons, 445 Fort Pitt Blvd

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Dennis R. Biondo, Jr.

Attorney at Allegheny County Law Department

445 Ft. Pitt Blvd., Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) STATUS REPORT JOINT by ALAN BOOTH, EMILY COWEY, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CHELSEA SCHMIDT. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Spencer Scott on behalf of COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Scott, Virginia) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

18 #7

Certificate of Service

18 #6

Proposed Order

18 #5

Declaration of Brandon Combs

18 #4

Declaration of Chelsea Schmidt

18 #2

Declaration of Alan Booth

18 #1

*Restricted*

#18

(#21) TEXT ORDER re #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion on or before Friday, 12/18/2020. In light of the Court granting in part Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limits, Defendants' Response may be up to 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/4/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#5

(#5) Errata re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALAN BOOTH, EMILY COWEY, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CHELSEA SCHMIDT. Reason for Correction: Due to a technical issue with the ECF system, the certificate of good standing could not be uploaded at the time the motion itself was initially filed, so the certificate is being uploaded separately through this errata.. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#4

(#5) Errata re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALAN BOOTH, EMILY COWEY, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CHELSEA SCHMIDT. Reason for Correction: Due to a technical issue with the ECF system, the certificate of good standing could not be uploaded at the time the motion itself was initially filed, so the certificate is being uploaded separately through this errata.. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ROBERT EVANCHICK. (nll) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA, WILLIAM MULLEN (Attachments: #1 Summons) (elt) Modified on 11/30/2020 to correct party name (nll). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA, ROBERT EVANCHICK, WILLIAM MULLEN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6118384), filed by CHELSEA SCHMIDT, EMILY COWEY, ALAN BOOTH, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (elt) Modified on 11/30/2020 to add party (nll). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Order re #29 Status Report. In light of the parties' representations that ongoing settlement discussions are productive and appear to advancing towards a global resolution of this case, the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report, on or before 2/3/2021, advising the Court of the status of those negotiations and whether the settlement of this case has been reached. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's 25 Order holding in abeyance any further briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction hereby remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/20/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STATUS REPORT JOINT by ALAN BOOTH, EMILY COWEY, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CHELSEA SCHMIDT. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Spencer Scott on behalf of COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Scott, Virginia) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#26) ORDER that, in light of the parties' representations during the status conference on 1/8/2021, that the parties are continuing to work productively towards a complete settlement of this case, including resolution of Plaintiffs' pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 1/19/2021, advising the Court of the status of those negotiations and whether the settlement of this case has been reached. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the ongoing settlement negotiations, the Court's previous 25 Order holding in abeyance any further briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction hereby remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/8/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Order re #24 Joint Status Report. In light of the parties' joint request for additional time to conduct settlement negotiations regarding Plaintiffs' #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and overall resolution of the case, and the parties' representations that such discussions are ongoing and fruitful, the Court hereby sets a telephone status conference for 1/8/2021 at 11:00 AM, and holds in abeyance any further briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction until that time. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/18/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT JOINT by WILLIAM MULLEN. (Michel, Lisa) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2020; Defendants' deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is vacated as more fully set forth in the attached order. The Court will issue a new briefing schedule after the parties file their Joint Status Report on 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/10/2020. (jmm) Modified on 12/11/2020 (jmm). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/10/2020 before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. (Court Reporter: Deborah Rowe) (jmm) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER re #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion on or before Friday, 12/18/2020. In light of the Court granting in part Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limits, Defendants' Response may be up to 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/4/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER that a Telephonic Status Conference regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 12/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/4/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELSEA SCHMIDT, EMILY COWEY, ALAN BOOTH, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.. COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Kraut, Adam) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa G. Michel on behalf of WILLIAM MULLEN. (Michel, Lisa) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/1/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/1/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Errata re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALAN BOOTH, EMILY COWEY, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CHELSEA SCHMIDT. Reason for Correction: Due to a technical issue with the ECF system, the certificate of good standing could not be uploaded at the time the motion itself was initially filed, so the certificate is being uploaded separately through this errata.. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for attorney Raymond M. DiGuiseppe to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6121666) by ALAN BOOTH, EMILY COWEY, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., CHELSEA SCHMIDT. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ROBERT EVANCHICK. (nll) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA, WILLIAM MULLEN (Attachments: #1 Summons) (elt) Modified on 11/30/2020 to correct party name (nll). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY, PENNSYLVANIA, ROBERT EVANCHICK, WILLIAM MULLEN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6118384), filed by CHELSEA SCHMIDT, EMILY COWEY, ALAN BOOTH, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (elt) Modified on 11/30/2020 to add party (nll). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Prince