This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:56:58 (UTC).

Coward v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Coward filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Tafoya and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth Coward

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather K. Jackson

Attorney at Rosenbaum & Wootton, P.C.

1902 West Colorado Avenue, Suite 110

Colorado Springs, CO 80904

Defendant Attorneys

Franklin D. Patterson

Attorney at Patterson Ripplinger PC-Greenwood Village

5613 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Karl A. Chambers

Attorney at Patterson Ripplinger PC-Greenwood Village

5613 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ruth Coward. (Jackson, Heather) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Franklin D. Patterson by Franklin D. Patterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#22

(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ruth Coward. (Jackson, Heather) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service

#15

(#15) AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 3/2/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/24/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/22/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Case Cover Sheet

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for re-assignment by Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn (evana, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2019CV032733. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7077768), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Answer, #6 Exhibit F - SOS Summary, #7 Exhibit G - Not to Set CMC, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#16

(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#23

(#23) COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 3/2/2020, ( Discovery due by 10/30/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020.). FTR: courtroom 01. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Answer

1 #7

Exhibit G - Not to Set CMC

#24

(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F - SOS Summary

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/2/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 3/2/2020, ( Discovery due by 10/30/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2020.). FTR: courtroom 01. (ksena) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ruth Coward. (Jackson, Heather) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ruth Coward. (Jackson, Heather) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/30/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #18 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00029 DDD. (Text Only Entry) (evana, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for re-assignment by Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn (evana, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00029-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 3/2/2020 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/24/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/22/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on December 10, 2019. (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Ruth Coward.(rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Karl A. Chambers by Karl A. Chambers on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Karl A. Chambers added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Chambers, Karl) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Franklin D. Patterson by Franklin D. Patterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2019CV032733. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7077768), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Answer, #6 Exhibit F - SOS Summary, #7 Exhibit G - Not to Set CMC, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patterson, Franklin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.