This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2022 at 08:02:47 (UTC).

Covis Pharma GmbH et al v. Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Covis Pharma GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kent A. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00971

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kent A. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Covis Pharma GmbH

AMAG Pharma USA, Inc.

AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Defendants

Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd.

Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd.

Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc.

AuroMedics Pharma LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Geoffrey Graham Grivner

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 720

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kody Macgyver Sparks

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

500 Delaware Avenue, Ste 720

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: June 8, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: May 2, 2036. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/24/2023. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,304,962. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Covis Group S.a r.l., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for Covis Pharma GmbH; Corporate Parent AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for AMAG Pharma USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Covis Holdings US, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by AMAG Pharma USA, Inc., AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Covis Pharma GmbH. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd. on 7/25/2022. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Kent A. Jordan of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 7/27/2022. (rjb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kent A. Jordan of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Please include the initials of the Judge (KAJ) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF CIRCUIT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Kent A. Jordan of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 7/27/2022. (rjb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd. on 7/25/2022. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Covis Group S.a r.l., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for Covis Pharma GmbH; Corporate Parent AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for AMAG Pharma USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Covis Holdings US, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Management, L.P. for AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by AMAG Pharma USA, Inc., AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Covis Pharma GmbH. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,304,962. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: June 8, 2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: May 2, 2036. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 5/24/2023. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against AuroMedics Pharma LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma, Ltd., Eugia Pharma Specialties Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3921875.) - filed by Covis Pharma GmbH, AMAG Pharma USA, Inc., AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EUGIA PHARMA SPECIALTIES LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where AuroMedics Pharma LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant