Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 09:40:59 (UTC).

Covert v. Cellco Partnership

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Covert filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00202

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kanika Covert

Defendant

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew R. Zenner

Attorney at Zenner Law, PLLC

320 Seven Springs Way, Suite 250

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant Attorneys

Sally F. Barron

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP (Memphis Office)

999 Shady Grove Road, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38120

Craig A. Cowart

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP (Memphis Office)

999 Shady Grove Road, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Cellco Partnership. (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on May 11, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. #4 . The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Cowart on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Cowart, Craig) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#7

(#7) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership. (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Cellco Partnership.(Barron, Sally) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/12/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

1 #3

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cellco Partnership from Chancery Court for Williamson County, Tennessee, case number 20CV49979. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3330629) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (dt). Modified on 3/12/2021 (dt). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Cellco Partnership. (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on May 11, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. #4 . The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/23/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Craig A. Cowart and Sally F. Barron admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Cowart on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Cowart, Craig) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership. (Barron, Sally) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Cellco Partnership.(Barron, Sally) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/12/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Sally F. Barron, Matthew R. Zenner admitted to this court. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cellco Partnership from Chancery Court for Williamson County, Tennessee, case number 20CV49979. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3330629) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (dt). Modified on 3/12/2021 (dt). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew R. Zenner