This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2021 at 09:44:56 (UTC).

Couture v. Envoy Air Inc

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Couture filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Envoy Air Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00705

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patrick Couture

Patrick J Couture

Defendants

Envoy Air Inc

Envoy Air Inc doing business as Envoy Airlines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Gillespie

Attorney at Gillespie Sanford LLP

4803 Gaston Ave.

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorneys

Tracey R Wallace

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

500 N Akard, Suite 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

Ethan J Davis

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

500 North Akard, Suite 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan J Davis on behalf of Envoy Air Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Davis, Ethan) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Envoy Air Inc. (Wallace, Tracey) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Envoy Air Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tracey R Wallace added to party Envoy Air Inc(pty:dft) (Wallace, Tracey) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Envoy Air Inc; served on 3/26/2021. (jmg) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Envoy Air Inc. (hml) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patrick Couture identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate American Airlines Group Inc for Envoy Air Inc. (Gillespie, Joseph) Modified text on 3/26/2021 (hml). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Envoy Air Inc filed by Patrick Couture. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11733122) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVOY AIR INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracey R Wallace

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ethan J. Davis