This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:58:44 (UTC).

Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01230

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Appellant

Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC

Defendant

BHP Billiton Petroleum (TxLA Operating) Company

Appellee

Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC

In Re

Goodrich Petroleum Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

William Alan Pesnell

Attorney at The Pesnell Law Firm APLC

400 Travis St, Ste 1100

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorney

Jonna Noel Summers

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St, 36Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002

Appellee Attorneys

Nugent Dwayne Beaty, Jr

Attorney at Pierce and O'Neill, LLP

4203 Montrose Blvd.

Houston, TX 77006

Jesse R Pierce

Attorney at Pierce O'Neill LLP

4203 Montrose Blvd.

Houston, TX 77006

In Re Attorney

Frank C. Brame

Attorney at The Brame Law Firm

3333 Lee Parkway, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Appellee's BRIEF by BHP Billiton Petroleum (TxLA Operating) Company, filed.(Summers, Jonna) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#18

(#18) Appellee's BRIEF by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Oil, Gas and Mineral Lease)(Pierce, Jesse) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

18 #1

Appendix 1 - Oil, Gas and Mineral Lease

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Amend #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court. The issues on appeal are amended to include the issues surrounding the determinations of the Bankruptcy Court in regard to the term beneficial interest. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) Modified on 6/14/2019 (chorace). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

14 #2

Exhibit Memorandum in Support

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - motion for leave to appeal issues and questions

14 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION to Amend #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, by Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - motion for leave to appeal issues and questions, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pesnell, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#1

(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 4/3/2019, Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth Hoyt, Civil Action 19-1230. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Memorandum Opinion, #3 Order)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #3

Order

1 #2

Memorandum Opinion

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Alan Pesnell on behalf of Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. (Pesnell, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit Decision Appealed From

#15

(#15) Appellant's BRIEF by Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision Appealed From, #2 Exhibit Ruling Appealed From)(Pesnell, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

15 #2

Exhibit Ruling Appealed From

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Deadlines by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beaty, Nugent) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Deadlines.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Appellee's BRIEF by BHP Billiton Petroleum (TxLA Operating) Company, filed.(Summers, Jonna) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Appellee's BRIEF by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Oil, Gas and Mineral Lease)(Pierce, Jesse) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Amend #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court. The issues on appeal are amended to include the issues surrounding the determinations of the Bankruptcy Court in regard to the term beneficial interest. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) Modified on 6/14/2019 (chorace). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Alan Pesnell on behalf of Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. (Pesnell, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Appellant's BRIEF by Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision Appealed From, #2 Exhibit Ruling Appealed From)(Pesnell, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Amend #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of an Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court, by Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - motion for leave to appeal issues and questions, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pesnell, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Deadlines.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Deadlines by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beaty, Nugent) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 4/29/2019, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Kenneth Hoyt, Civil Action 19-1230. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Marvin Isgur re: #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Clerks Notice of Filing of a Cross Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 4/16/2019, Goodrich Petroleum Company LLC filed a notice of cross appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth Hoyt, Civil Action 19-1230. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Cross Appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beaty, Nugent) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (Nonopposition), filed by BHP Billiton Petroleum (TxLA Operating) Company. (Summers, Jonna) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nugent D. Beaty, Jr. on behalf of Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, filed. (Beaty, Nugent) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Pierce on behalf of Goodrich Petroleum Company, LLC, filed. (Pierce, Jesse) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachments)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 4/3/2019, Coushatta Bayou Land Company LLC filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth Hoyt, Civil Action 19-1230. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Memorandum Opinion, #3 Order)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.