Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 09:13:58 (UTC).

Courtney v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Courtney filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00127

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dewey Courtney

Kimberly Courtney

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Eaton Hydraulics

Viacomcbs Inc

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Block Drug Company Inc

ITT Inc

Genuine Parts Company

Honeywell International Inc

Chattem Inc

Himmel Management Co LLC sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corporation, successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond STerilizing Powder Company also known as The Gold Bond Company also known as Himmel Group doing business as Himm

Velan Valve Corp

National Automotive Parts Associations LLC

Thrush Co Inc

Eaton Hydraulics LLC

Block Drug Corporation

Eaton Hydraulics Inc

Crane Environmental Inc

McWane Inc sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Clow Corporation doing business as Clow Valve Company

Hoffman Lawler Velve

96 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Ivett Montemayor

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier

1201 Elm Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

H Barret Marshall, Jr

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 4100W

Dallas, TX 75201

Jillian van Rensburg Keith

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75202

Brady Sherrod Edwards

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Reed Cullen Randel

Attorney at Thompson & Kngiht LLP

One Arts Plaza, 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Gary D Elliston

Attorney at DeHay & Elliston LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3500

Dallas, TX 75202

Wes Sprague

Attorney at Sheehy Serpe & Ware

Two Houston Center, 909 Fannin, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010-1003

Other Attorneys

Douglas B Dougherty

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 2350

Houston, TX 77002

Maryalyce Cox

Attorney at MehaffyWeber PC

500 Dallas Street, Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77002

Andrew R Stubblefield

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1201 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75270

Mari Bryn Dowdy

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer Mahoney Ltd

100 Congress Ave, Suite 800

Austin, TX 78701

Jason James Irvin

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Peter J Strelitz

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

100 Congress Ave, Suite 800

Austin, TX 78701

Elizabeth H Ryan

Attorney at Coats Rose

365 Canal St, Suite 800

New Orleans, LA 70130

Linda J Broocks

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

711 Louisiana, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey Stewart Davis

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Kent M Adams

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

909 Fannin, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77010

Mackenzie Salenger

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Pamela J Williams

Attorney at DeHay & Elliston LLP

3500 Bank Of America Plaza, 901 Main St

Dallas, TX 75202

Henry Scott Wehrmann

Attorney at Farrow-Gillespie Heath Witter LLP

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

98 #1

Remand Letter

#98

(#98) ORDER granting #74 Motion to Remand to State Court. The case is hereby remanded to County Court at Law No. 4, Dallas County, Texas. Each party shall be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred as a result of removal of this action to this Court. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/13/2021) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (oyh) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

97 #1

Proposed Order

#97

(#97) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel for Sole Purpose of Re-Filing Agreed Motion to Dismiss filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/15/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#96

(#96) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason James Irvin on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Irvin, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

95 #1

Proposed Order

#95

(#95) Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hopeman Brothers Inc Without Prejudice filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Elizabeth H Ryan added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

74 #1

Proposed Order

#74

(#98) ORDER granting #74 Motion to Remand to State Court. The case is hereby remanded to County Court at Law No. 4, Dallas County, Texas. Each party shall be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred as a result of removal of this action to this Court. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/13/2021) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (oyh) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

4 #2

Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Paul Smith

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Paul Smith)Attorney H Barret Marshall, Jr added to party Eaton Hydraulics LLC(pty:dft) (Marshall, H) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by SPX Corporation. (Horne, Nathan) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet Supplement

#1

(#9) Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal filed by The William Powell Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Barron, Barbara) Modified event text on 1/27/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) ORDER granting #74 Motion to Remand to State Court. The case is hereby remanded to County Court at Law No. 4, Dallas County, Texas. Each party shall be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred as a result of removal of this action to this Court. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/13/2021) (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (oyh) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel for Sole Purpose of Re-Filing Agreed Motion to Dismiss filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/15/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason James Irvin on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Irvin, Jason) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hopeman Brothers Inc Without Prejudice filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Elizabeth H Ryan added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Ryan, Elizabeth) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendants Dominion Energy, Inc. and Dominion Energy Gas Holdings and Virginia Electric and Power Company filed by Dewey Courtney, Kimberly Courtney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Montemayor, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE of Dismissal Voluntary Without Prejudice as to Raytheon Technologies Corporation filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel (unopposed) filed by Aurora Pump Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel) (Dougherty, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Company. (Dougherty, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Aurora Pump Company. Related document: #15 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Aurora Pump CompanyAttorney Douglas B Dougherty added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft) (Dougherty, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (Salenger, Mackenzie) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Supplement to #1 Notice of Removal filed by The William Powell Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Barron, Barbara) Modified event text on 1/27/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marshall, H) Modified to terminate and remove the motion to expedite on 1/27/2021 (cea). Modified text on 1/27/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval Inc. (Williams, Pamela) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***WITHDRAWN PER #55 ORDER*** First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #2 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Pamela J Williams added to party Alfa Laval Inc(pty:dft) (Williams, Pamela) Modified docket text on 2/10/2021 (oyh). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eaton Hydraulics LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Eaton Corporation plc for Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Marshall, H) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Paul Smith)Attorney H Barret Marshall, Jr added to party Eaton Hydraulics LLC(pty:dft) (Marshall, H) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by SPX Corporation. (Horne, Nathan) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Wed Jan 20 15:52:27 CST 2021 (crt) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11529042) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Marshall, H) Modified docket text on 1/20/2021 (oyh). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EATON-HYDRAULICS INDIVIDUALLY & AS is a litigant

Latest cases where BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Himmel Management Co. LLC is a litigant