This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:50:41 (UTC).

Courtney v. Arbon

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Courtney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Arbon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tena Campbell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tena Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl M. Courtney

Ogden, UT 84412

Defendant

Ryan Arbon

Not Classified By Court

Prisoner Litigation Unit

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the court from Plaintiff, regarding payment & amdended complaint. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: IFP payment of $25.93 within 30 days. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Carl M. Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 09/14/2020. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Ryan Arbon filed by Plaintiff Carl M. Courtney. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

6 #3

rescanned for ocr

6 #2

Envelope 1

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet 1

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT against Ryan Arbon (Originally received by the court on 09/09/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Carl M. Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (dw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2020: #3 rescanned for ocr) (jl). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Carl M. Courtney. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the court from Plaintiff, regarding payment & amdended complaint. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: IFP payment of $25.93 within 30 days. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT TO COLLECTION OF FEES from Inmate Trust Account filed by Carl M. Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 09/14/2020. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Ryan Arbon filed by Plaintiff Carl M. Courtney. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against Ryan Arbon (Originally received by the court on 09/09/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Carl M. Courtney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (dw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2020: #3 rescanned for ocr) (jl). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 09/14/2020. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Carl M. Courtney. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $25.93. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 09/14/2020. (dw) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Carl M. Courtney received from Correctional Institution (dw) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 09/09/2020) filed by Plaintiff Carl M. Courtney. (dw) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less