This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 11:02:51 (UTC).

Courtney v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Courtney filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina M Rodriguez and Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02768

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Regina M Rodriguez

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harold Courtney

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Cheri R. Lazar

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/01/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Harold Courtney Attorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Harold Courtney (pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, CCCS, and Complaint upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 10/5/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Harold Courtney.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#3

#2

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/01/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 11/30/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Harold Courtney Attorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Harold Courtney (pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, CCCS, and Complaint upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 10/5/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Harold Courtney.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Denver County - District, Case Number 2021CV032862. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8125930), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheri R. Lazar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel