This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:45:36 (UTC).

Courtesy Properties, LLC v. S&ME, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Courtesy Properties, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ME, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02097

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Courtesy Properties, LLC

Defendants

S&ME, Inc.

Atkins North America, Inc.

CFN (I-20), Inc.

CFN (I-20), Inc. doing business as Cadillac Fairview

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael West Evans

Attorney at Cox, Byington, Twyman & Johnson, LLP

711 Broad Street

Rome, GA 30161

Christopher Paul Twyman

Attorney at Cox, Byington, Twyman & Johnson, LLP

711 Broad Street

Rome, GA 30161

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W. Lord

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Steven Jacob Carroll

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP -Atl

Suite 1600, 100 Galleria Parkway

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Grant Edward Schnell

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP -Atl

One Regions Plaza, Suite 1800, 1180 West Peachtree St., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3407

John Michael Hamrick

Attorney at Holland & Knight-Atlanta

1180 West Peachtree Street, N.W., One Atlantic Center, Suite 1800

Atlanta, GA 30309-3453

Vincent Justin Arpey

Attorney at Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP

303 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3600

Atlanta, GA 30308

John Hartshorn Elliott

Attorney at Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP

303 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3600

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#37

(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Courtesy Properties, LLC. (Twyman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#36

(#36) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by S&ME, Inc.. (Carroll, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#35

(#35) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the First Amended Complaint filed by Courtesy Properties, LLC. (Twyman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

31 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

31 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

31 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#31

(#31) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Atkins North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Schnell, Grant) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

26 #1

Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of CFN's Motion to Dismiss First Amended

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atkins North America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed within #1 Notice of Removal is due 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/20/2020. (jed) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#30) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Lord, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#3

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atkins North America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed within #1 Notice of Removal is due 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/20/2020. (jed) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#2

(#2) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -2 -Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit -1 -State Court Pleadings

#1

(#8) NOTICE by CFN (I-20), Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Notice of Removal (Arpey, Vincent) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Courtesy Properties, LLC. (Twyman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by S&ME, Inc.. (Carroll, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in the First Amended Complaint filed by Courtesy Properties, LLC. (Twyman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Strike and Objection to the Affidavit of Dennis A. Huckaba, P.E. [19-8] with Brief In Support by S&ME, Inc.. (Carroll, Steven) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. S&ME, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #19 Amended Complaint on or before July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/2/2020. (jed) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Atkins North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Schnell, Grant) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Order (Lord, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Elliott, John) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Arpey, Vincent) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by CFN (I-20), Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Notice of Removal (Arpey, Vincent) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Schnell, Grant) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hamrick, John) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atkins North America, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed within #1 Notice of Removal is due 5/29/2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/20/2020. (jed) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on May 20, 2020. (ash) (ash). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Atkins North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schnell, Grant) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by CFN (I-20), Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9701549) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -2 -Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atkins North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Paul Twyman