This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 09:02:06 (UTC).

County Of Westchester v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 County Of Westchester filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Actavis Holdco US, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04474

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County Of Westchester

Defendants

ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.

ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC

ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.

ALVOGEN INC.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

APOTEX CORP.

AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.

BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.

Bausch Health US Inc.

BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.

CITRON PHARMA LLC

DAVA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

Dr Reddys Laboratories, Inc.

ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC

FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Allen Robertson

Norton Rose Fulbright Us Llp (Nyc-Fifth Ave), 666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10103

ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN

Attorney at NORTON ROSE FULBRIGHT US LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6092

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Copy of the State Court docket)

1 #3

Exhibit C (Copies of any other documents filed on the State Court docket)

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

7 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(ADELSTEIN, ROBIN) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN D. ADELSTEIN on behalf of BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC with Certificate of Service(ADELSTEIN, ROBIN) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:21-cv-07893. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/12/2021) (sjo)[Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. The parties stipulate that all defendants in this lawsuit shall have through and including (a) 60 days after the entry of a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action ( or otherwise fmally denying transfer of this action to the MDL); or (b) a time agreed upon by the parties or ordered by Judge Rufe following the transfer of this case to the action captioned In Re Generic Pharmaceuticals Pricing Antitrust Litigation, pending before the Honorable Cynthia Rufe in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. So ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/24/21) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Oceanside Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC..(Robertson, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bausch Health Companies Inc. for Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Oceanside Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC. Document filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Oceanside Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC..(Robertson, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Allen Robertson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: G&W Laboratories,Inc.; Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc, USA; Hikma Lab Inc., Mayne Pharma Inc.; Mutual Pharmaceuticals Co., Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Robertson, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 61946/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25092429).Document filed by Bausch Health Americas, Inc., Bausch Health US Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Oceanside Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Copy of the State Court docket), #3 Exhibit C (Copies of any other documents filed on the State Court docket)).(Robertson, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/12/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITRON PHARMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Alvogen Group, Inc. is a litigant