This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2020 at 09:36:49 (UTC).

County of Suffolk v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 County of Suffolk filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Actavis Holdco US, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04893

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Suffolk

Defendants

BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.

PLIVA, INC.

MYLAN INC

HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC

MALLINCKRODT LLC

RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

ASCEND LABORATORIES, LLC

ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC

ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC

AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC

TELIGENT INC.

G&W LABORATORIES, INC.

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REGINA MARIE CALCATERRA

JANINE LEE POLLACK

MICHAEL MILTON LISKOW

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN F. HOLT

Other Attorneys

NATHAN M. BUCHTER

GERALD E. ARTH

RYAN THOMAS BECKER

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #2

Certificate of Service

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN THOMAS BECKER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BECKER, RYAN) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/12/2020. 11/12/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO. 1590 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Waive Service and Extend the Deadline for Defendants to Respond to County of Suffolk's August 27, 2020 Complaint by MYLAN INC, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(HOLT, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF SUFFOLK'S CLAIMS AGAINST RISING PHARMA HOLDINGS, INC. ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/29/2020. 10/29/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOC NO. 1572 IN 16-MD-2724)(kp, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by MALLINCKRODT INC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware filed under case number 20-12522 (JTD) . (WILLIS, JANE) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04009. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/05/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020

DocketCase transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 10/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13) Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of August 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Cynthia M. Rufe. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 10/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
09/01/2020

DocketYour proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: The caption on the summonses do not match the caption as it appears on the complaint. If there are multiple parties that do not fit, you must attach a rider with the full caption. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020

DocketIncorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by County of Suffolk (Calcaterra, Regina) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 08/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Janine Lee Pollack on behalf of County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, Janine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Milton Liskow on behalf of County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Liskow, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2020

DocketFILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13278580 (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by County of Suffolk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 9/1/2020 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/5/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less