This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 07:48:36

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Other case was filed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY against PURDUE PHARMA L P in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-17138
  • Filing Date 08/23/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp
  • Courthouse New Jersey District

Party Details

  • Defendant ABBOTT LABORATORIES
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant BEVERLY SACKLER
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
  • Represented By
    • EILEEN O. MUSKETT
    • JOHN JOSEPH HAGGERTY
  • Defendant RICHARD S. SACKLER
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 ENGAGED IN THE DISTRIBUTION OF OPIOIDS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant MALLINCKRODT LLC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

32 #21

Exhibit 19

Fees Apply
32 #20

Exhibit 18

Fees Apply
32 #19

Exhibit 17

Fees Apply
32 #18

Exhibit 16

Fees Apply
32 #17

Exhibit 15

Fees Apply
32 #16

Exhibit 14

Fees Apply
32 #15

Exhibit 13

Fees Apply
32 #14

Exhibit 12

Fees Apply
32 #13

Exhibit 11

Fees Apply
32 #12

Exhibit 10

Fees Apply
32 #11

Exhibit 9

Fees Apply
#32

(#32) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#32) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#31) BRIEF in Opposition filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION re #28 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Ocean County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#30) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (KASSAN, RANDI) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#29) Corporate Disclosure Statement by H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY identifying AmeriSourceBergen Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MUSKETT, EILEEN) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
  • 10/03/2019
  • Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Ocean County. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#28) MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of New Jersey Law Division: Ocean County by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Dkt. No. 1, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GROSSMAN, MARC) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by COUNTY OF OCEAN, NEW JERSEY. (GROSSMAN, MARC) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
  • 09/19/2019
  • (#26) NOTICE by PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC. OF SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (MATTHEWS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by KURT MICHAEL MULLEN on behalf of JOHN N. KAPOOR (MULLEN, KURT) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#24) ORDER that Defendants shall have through and including 30 days after the later (i) of this Courts ruling on any motion to remand, should Plaintiff file one, or (ii) the final decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding any transfer of this case to the multidistrict litigation In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio), to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/13/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 09/13/2019
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS L.P., PAR PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANIES, INC., JOHN N. KAPOOR, ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ABBOTT LABORATORIES, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., SPECGX LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, ACTAVIS LLC, RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMERICAN PAIN FOUNDATION, WALGREENS EASTERN CO., INC., MALLINCKRODT PLC, STUART D. BAKER, WALGREEN, CO., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, RITE AID CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, WALMART INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, CEPHALON, INC., H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN USA INC., ANDA, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/13/2019. (eaj) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 09/13/2019
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NORAMCO, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/25/2019. (jem) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 09/13/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #18 Application for Extension of Time filed by Russell Hewit, Esq. on 9/11/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing and will forward this request to chambers. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#23) Letter from McKesson Corporation re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Respond to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Letter Requesting Extension of Time (corrected), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order (corrected))(HEWIT, RUSSELL) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#22) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Noramco, Inc... (PENARO, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN L. PENARO on behalf of NORAMCO, INC. (PENARO, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JOSEPH HAGGERTY on behalf of H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY (HAGGERTY, JOHN) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN O. MUSKETT on behalf of H. D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY (MUSKETT, EILEEN) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.