This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:48:35 (UTC).

County of Maui v. Sunoco LP; et al.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 County of Maui filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Sunoco LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and DERRICK K. WATSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00470

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Maui

Defendants

Phillips 66 Company

BP America Inc.

Royal Dutch Shell PLC

Shell Oil Products Company LLC

Aloha Petroleum LLC

Phillips 66

BHP Group Limited

ConocoPhillips Company

Shell Oil Company

Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

BHP Hawaii Inc.

BHP Group PLC

Chevron Corp

Marathon Petroleum Corp.

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation

Exxon Mobil Corp.

BP PLC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richelle M. Thomson

Attorney at Department of the Corporation Counsel Maui

200 S High St, Fl. 3

Wailuku, HI 96793

Moana Monique Lutey

Attorney at Department of the Corporation Counsel

200 S High St

Wailuku, HI 96793

Defendant Attorneys

Gabriella Kapp

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Jonathan W. Hughes

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

10Th Floor Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew T. Heartney

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Lisa A. Bail

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600, Fax: 5475880

Honolulu, HI 96813

David C. Frederick

Attorney at Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel & Frederick PLLC

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Joachim P. Cox

Attorney at Cox Fricke A Limited Liability Law Partnership LLP

800 Bethel Street, Suite 600, 585-9440

Honolulu, HI 96813

C. Michael Heihre

Attorney at Cades Schutte LLP

Cades Schutte Building, 1000 Bishop Street 12Th Flr, 521-9200, Fax: 540-5009

Honolulu, HI 96813

Boaz S. Morag

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Breon S. Peace

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Victor L. Hou

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Jameson R. Jones

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Ross T. Shinyama

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop St Suite 1250, 544-8300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Summer H. Kaiawe

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop St Suite 1250, 544-8300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Melvyn M. Miyagi

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop Street, Suite 1250, 544-8300, Fax: 544-8399

Honolulu, HI 96813

Ann Marie Mortimer

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel J. Toal

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 6Th Ave.

New York, NY 10019

Theodore V. Wells, Jr.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 6Th Ave.

New York, NY 10019

Deborah K. Wright

Attorney at Wright & Kirschbraun LLLC

1885 Main St Ste 108

Wailuku, HI 96793

56 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

96 #20

Exhibit 17

96 #18

Exhibit 15

96 #17

Exhibit 14

96 #16

Exhibit 13

96 #15

Exhibit 12

96 #14

Exhibit 11

96 #13

Exhibit 10

96 #12

Exhibit 9

96 #11

Exhibit 8

1 #24

Exhibit 23

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Melvyn M. Miyagi in Support of Notice of Removal

241 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard Tyler Priest, #2 Declaration Declaration of Dr. Mark R. Wilson, #3 Declaration Declaration of Melvyn M. Miyagi, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW T. HEARTNEY re #91 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/17/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOHN D. LOMBARDO re #89 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/17/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JONATHAN W. HUGHES re #88 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/17/2020. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) EO: The Court is in receipt the #57 parties Joint REQUEST to Vacate Scheduling Conference and has reviewed the status of the case. In light of the pending #74 Motion to Remand to State Court, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 01/05/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 03/30/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 03/23/2020. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Heartney Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461811.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Errata re #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jonathan W. Hughes Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461192. Declaration of Counsel Attached to Motion for PHV of Jonathan Hughes. (Bail, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of John D. Lombardo Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461717.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jonathan W. Hughes Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461192.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #87 Joint Request to Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., requires the court's approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EO: COURT (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTICIPATED MOTION TO REMAND AND (2) STAYING CASE IN PART. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON) (emt, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action with State Court Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 11/30/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00470 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Additional Exhibits (Additional Exhibits "66" - "79") to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66, #2 Exhibit 67, #3 Exhibit 68, #4 Exhibit 69, #5 Exhibit 70, #6 Exhibit 71, #7 Exhibit 72, #8 Exhibit 73, #9 Exhibit 74, #10 Exhibit 75, #11 Exhibit 76, #12 Exhibit 77, #13 Exhibit 78, #14 Exhibit 79, #15 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 11/1/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Additional Exhibits (Additional Exhibits "46" - "65") to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46, #2 Exhibit 47, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 50, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 52, #8 Exhibit 53, #9 Exhibit 54, #10 Exhibit 55, #11 Exhibit 56, #12 Exhibit 57, #13 Exhibit 58, #14 Exhibit 59, #15 Exhibit 60, #16 Exhibit 61, #17 Exhibit 62, #18 Exhibit 63, #19 Exhibit 64, #20 Exhibit 65)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 11/1/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Additional Exhibits (Additional Exhibits "26" - "45") to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38, #14 Exhibit 39, #15 Exhibit 40, #16 Exhibit 41, #17 Exhibit 42, #18 Exhibit 43, #19 Exhibit 44, #20 Exhibit 45)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 11/1/2020 (emt, ). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation from Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 2CCV-20-0000283. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2442747), filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melvyn M. Miyagi in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Miyagi, Melvyn) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacifica Resources, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC is a litigant