This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 16:01:46 (UTC).

County of Lycoming v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 County of Lycoming filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45655

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Actavis Totowa LLC

Mylan Institutional, Inc.

McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Actavis South Atlantic LLC

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Rite Aid of Maryland

Purdue Holdings L.P.

Rite Aid of New York, Inc.

Stuart D. Baker

H.D. Smith LLC

Walgreen Co.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

CVS Indiana L.L.C.

Qualitest Pharmaceuticals

79 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

John C. Cherundolo

Attorney at Cherundolo Law Firm

17Th Floor - Axa Tower One, 100 Madison Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

Bruce J. Phillips

Attorney at Wetzel, Caverly, Phillips & Rodgers

1170 Highway 315

Plains, PA 18702

Eva Brindisi Pearlman

Attorney at Brindisi, Murad & Brindisi Pearlman

2713 Genesee Street

Utica, NY 13501

Louis T. Brindisi

Attorney at Brindisi, Murad & Brindisi Pearlman

2713 Genesee Street

Utica, NY 13501

Robert F. Julian

2037 Genesee Street

Utica, NY 13501

John Petrone

Attorney at Petrone, Petrone Law

1624 Genesee Street

Utica, NY 13502

Sara E. Silva

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Boston

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

Safa W. Osmani

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Boston

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

Maria R. Durant

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Boston

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#83

#82

#81

#80

#79

#78

#77

#76

#75

#6

#5

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Insys Therapeutics Inc. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Sandoz Inc. waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 09/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. Anda Inc waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 08/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by County of Lycoming. DEPOMED, INC. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of County of Lycoming (Pearlman, Eva) (Entered: 08/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Attorney Appearance by Maria R. Durant filed by on behalf of Indivior Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Attorney Appearance by Sara E. Silva filed by on behalf of Indivior Inc.. (Silva, Sara) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Attorney Appearance by Safa W. Osmani filed by on behalf of Indivior Inc.. (Osmani, Safa) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 4:19-cv-01039. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MDL 2084 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-102) TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio; (ep) [Transferred from pamd on 7/22/2019.] (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION: copy of complaint emailed to MDL Panel. (lg) [Transferred from pamd on 7/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg) [Transferred from pamd on 7/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4792277), filed by County of Lycoming. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg) [Transferred from pamd on 7/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARDUE HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Indiana L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where MCKESSON SPECIALTY CARE DISTRIBUTION LLC is a litigant