This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2021 at 06:46:01 (UTC).

County of Jim Wells v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 County of Jim Wells filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45884

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Jim Wells

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Abbott Laboratories

McKesson Corporation

Walgreen Co

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

CVS Pharmacy Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

CVS Health Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Purdue Pharma Inc.

Amerisource Bergen Corporation

Allergan PLC

Walmart Stores Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shelly A. Sanford

Attorney at Watts Guerra - Austin

811 Barton Springs Road

Austin, TX 78704

J. Javier Gutierrez

700 East Third Street

Alice, TX 78332

Baldemar F. Gutierrez

700 E. Third Street

Alice, TX 78332

Joseph Michael Guerra

P.O. Box 1968

Alice, TX 78333

Jay H. Henderson

Attorney at Cruse Scott Henderson & Allen

7Th Floor, 2777 Allen Parkway

Houston, TX 77019

Kenneth T. Fibich

Attorney at INVALID ADDRESS - Fibich Hampton Leebron & Garth

1401 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Armando G. Barrera

Attorney at Barrera Barrera

700 East Second

Alice, TX 78333

Kathryn Snapka

P.O. Drawer 23017

Corpus Christi, TX 78403

Mikal C. Watts

Attorney at Watts Guerra - San Antonio

Bldg.3, Ste. 100, 4 Dominion Drive

San Antonio, TX 78257

Defendant Attorneys

Joel Cameron Simon

Attorney at Fernelius Simon

1221 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77010

Craig Smyser

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan & Veselka

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Charles C. Lifland

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lindsey Beth Cohan

Attorney at Dechert

300 West Sixth Street

Austin, TX 78701

Nancy Patterson

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Mark E. Torian

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1201 Elm Street

Dallas, TX 75270

Hannah DeMarco Sibiski

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Halley Bernick

Attorney at Reed Smith

811 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Donna M. Welch

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Chicago

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Elizabeth Weaver Scofield

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Street

Houston, TX 77002

Laura Jane Durfee

Attorney at Jones Day - Dallas

2727 North Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

7 #6

Exhibit 6

7 #5

Exhibit 5

7 #4

Exhibit 4

7 #3

Exhibit 3

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

2 #1

Proposed Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-03580. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-114) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER entered: CVS's motion to stay, (Docket Entry No. 6), is granted. The motion to remand, (Docket Entry No. 5), is denied, without prejudice to reassertion.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM In Support of re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Jay) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corrected MOTION for Confidential Treatment of file earlier as "agreed" which was not correct( Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.), Corrected MOTION for Entry of Order re: Motion to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. (Henderson, Jay) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by CVS Healthcare Corporation for a Temporary Stay Pending Transfer, filed by County of Jim Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibich, Kenneth) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETED IN ERROR. MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibich, Kenneth) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 201949073 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23226017) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark) [Transferred from txsd on 10/23/2019.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amerisource Bergen Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant