This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:24:34 (UTC).

County of Jim Wells v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 County of Jim Wells filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03580

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Jim Wells

Defendants

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Actavis Pharma Inc.

Abbott Laboratories

McKesson Corporation

Walgreen Co

Endo Health Solutions Inc

Purdue Pharma, L.P.

CVS Health Corporation

Actavis LLC

Allergan PLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Walmart Stores Inc

Cardinal Health Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Purdue Pharma Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Amerisource Bergen Corporation

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Baldemar F Gutierrez

Attorney at Attorney at Law

700 E Third Street

Alice, TX 78332

Kenneth T Fibich

Attorney at Fibich Leebron Copeland Briggs

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

J. Javier Gutierrez

Attorney at The Gutierrez Law Firm, Inc.

700 East Third Street

Alice, TX 78332

Joseph Michael Guerra

Attorney at Law Office of J. Michael Guerra

Po Box 1968

Alice, TX 78333

Mikal C Watts

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

4 Dominion Dr, Bldg 3, Ste 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Shelly A. Sanford

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

811 Barton Springs Rd, Ste 725

Austin, TX 78704

Kathryn Snapka

Attorney at The Snapka Law Firm

Po Drawer 23017

Corpus Christi, TX 78403

Jay Hodges Henderson

Attorney at Fibuch Leebron Copeland Briggs Josephson LLP

1150 Bissonnet

Houston, TX 77005

Armando G Barrera

Attorney at Barrera Barrera

700 East 2Nd

Alice, TX 78333

Defendant Attorneys

Mark E Torian

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1201 Elm St, Ste 4400

Dallas, TX 75270

Nancy Lynne Patterson

Attorney at Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

James G Martingano

Attorney at Mehaffy Weber

500 Dallas Street, Suite 120

Houston, TX 77002

Hannah DeMarco Sibiski

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP - Houston

700 Louisiana St., Suite 4000, Bank Of America Tower

Houston, TX 77002

Lindsey Beth Cohan

Attorney at Dechert LLP

300 West 6Th St

Austin, TX 78701

Donna M Welch

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Elizabeth Weaver Scofield

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Laura Jane Durfee

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael W Mengis

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Charles C Lifland

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 S Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael Halley Bernick

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main St, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #8 Order, Set/Clear Flags, filed. (dwilkerson, 3) ** Firm address updated ** DE #8 renoticed. (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • RECEIPT of Transfer received via email notification re: transfer of case to Northern District of Ohio. New Case # assigned: 1:19-op-45884 and received on 10/23/2019., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-114) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER entered: CVS's motion to stay, (Docket Entry No. 6), is granted. The motion to remand, (Docket Entry No. 5), is denied, without prejudice to reassertion.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM In Support of re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Torian, Mark) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidisrict Litigation by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corrected MOTION for Confidential Treatment of file earlier as "agreed" which was not correct( Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019.), Corrected MOTION for Entry of Order re: Motion to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. (Henderson, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by CVS Healthcare Corporation for a Temporary Stay Pending Transfer, filed by County of Jim Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibich, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETED IN ERROR. MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Wells, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibich, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 201949073 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23226017) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amerisource Bergen Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant