This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 08:14:29 (UTC).

COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY et al v. STRADER

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STRADER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01406

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF PITTSBURGH

COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY

SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH

Defendant

VANCE STRADER

Pittsburgh, PA 15235

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily J. Mueller

437 Grant Street, 14Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Christopher C. Malloy

Attorney at Goehring, Rutter & Boehm

Frick Building, 437 Grant Streeet, 14Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

David L. Scherer

437 Grant Street, 14Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 325160

Joseph W. Gramc

437 Grant Street, 14Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VANCE STRADER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jm) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Notice of Removal

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by VANCE STRADER. (jm) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice of Removal, filed by VANCE STRADER. (cjo) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice of Removal, filed by VANCE STRADER. (cjo) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to 2 Text Order due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by VANCE STRADER. (jm) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice of Removal, filed by VANCE STRADER. On October 29, 2019, Mr. Strader filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and notice of removal, alleging that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction under federal question jurisdiction. Yet, the action being removed appears to be an action in the Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas involving delinquent real estate tax collection matters brought by the County of Allegheny, City of Pittsburgh, and School District of Pittsburgh against Mr. Strader, which matters do not implicate any federal questions. In light of the above, it is HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Mr. Strader shall file a response to this ORDER by 11/15/2019, showing cause why this case should not be remanded to the Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas. Plaintiffs shall file a response by 11/22/2019, explaining why the action should be remanded. Responses shall be limited to 5 pages or less. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VANCE STRADER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jm) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.