This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2021 at 12:46:09 (UTC).

County of Albany et al v. Actavis Holdco US, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 County of Albany filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Actavis Holdco US, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01875

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

County of Schuyler

City of Mobile

WCA Group Health Trust

MEBCO

Defendants

BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.

TARO PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC

UDL LABORATORIES INC.

CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.

OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

TELIGENT INC.

HIKMA LABS, INC.

VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA LLC

IMPAX LABORATORIES INC.

VERSAPHARM INC.

TORRENT PHARMA INC.

PERRIGO NEW YORK INC.

CARACO PHARMACEUTICAL LABORATORIES, LTD.

GREENSTONE LLC

Bausch Health US Inc.

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JUSTIN W. BERNICK

JASMEET AHUJA

Heather Lamberg-Kafele

BRIAN J SMITH

Robin P. Summer

NICOLE L. CASTLE

ADAM C. HEMLOCK

TRACEY F MILICH

ERIK THOMAS KOONS

Other Attorneys

Victoria Peng-Rue

WILLIAM A. ESCOBAR

J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.

RYAN THOMAS BECKER

MEG TRACI SLACHETKA

RACHEL ADCOX

GEORGE G. GORDON

BRIAN T. FEENEY

Lauren Norris Donahue

EDWARD M. MATHIAS

ILANA H. EISENSTEIN

80 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Exhibit C - State Court Filings

1 #3

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BRYAN DANIEL GANT on behalf of TELIGENT INC.(GANT, BRYAN) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by HEATHER K. MCDEVITT on behalf of TELIGENT INC.(MCDEVITT, HEATHER) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by SAUL P MORGENSTERN on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, SAUL) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA S. SHORES on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(SHORES, LAURA) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET A. ROGERS on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC with Certificate of Service(ROGERS, MARGARET) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA S. PEREIRA on behalf of TELIGENT INC. with Certificate of Service(PEREIRA, VICTORIA) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ on behalf of TELIGENT INC. with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN J SMITH on behalf of TELIGENT INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01650. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2021

DocketCase electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
04/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants response to Complaint due either: (a) 60 days after the entry of a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL);or (b) a time agreed upon by the parties or ordered by the Eastern District of Pennsylvania following the transfer of this case to the action captioned In Re Generic Pharmaceuticals Pricing Antitrust Litigation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/2/2021. (Trimes, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc.. (Ahuja, Jasmeet) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021

DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. AttentionAlastair J.M. Findeis, Thomas A. Narducci, Seth Davis, Seth A. Moskowitz, Edward M. Mathias, Michael L. Keeley, Rachel Adcox, Lisa Rumin, Paul M. Thompson, Raymond Jacobsen, Melanie S. Carter, Terry M. Henry, Sarah O'Laughlin Kulik, Sean McConnell, Wayne A. Mack, Robin D. Adelstein, Alison Tanchyk, Amanda B. Robinson, J. Gordon Cooney, Jr., John Pease, William T. McEnroe, Sarah E. Hsu Wilbur, Heather Lamberg-Kafele, Keith R. Palfin, Anne E. Lemmo, Christopher P. Wilson, Erik T. Koons, Lauri A. Kavulich, Lindsay S. Fouse, Stacey L. Turner, John P. McClam, Tiffany E. Engsell, John E. Schmidtlein Sarah F. Kirkpatrick, Aaron Van Nostrand, Brian T. Feeney, Laura S. Shores, Melina R. DiMattio, R. Brendan Fee, Steven A. Reed, Wendy West Feinstein, Andrew C. Bernasconi, Edward B. Schwartz, Nicholas V. Albu, Jan P. Levine, Michael J. Hartman, Robin P. Summer, Jeremy A. Rist, Leiv Blad, Zarema Jaramillo, Brian J. Smith, Lauren Norris Donahue, Michael Martinez, Setven Kowal, Adam K. Levin, Benjamin Holt, Justin W. Bernick, Harvey Bartle, IV, John Clayton Everett, Scott Alan Stempel, Tracey F. Milich, Ben C. Fabens-Lassen, Edward S. Scheidman, Ilana H. Eisenstein, Devora Allon, Bradley Kitlowski, Jason R. Parish, Martin J. Amundson, George G. Gordon, Gerald Arth, Julia Chapman, Nathan Buchter, Ryan Becker. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Kirchner, Mary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021

DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/31/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/31/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Viatris Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan Holdings Sub Inc. for Mylan Inc.. (Ahuja, Jasmeet) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UDL Laboratories, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 619573/2020. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYEDC-14317585) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Filings, #5 Certificate of Service) (Ahuja, Jasmeet) Modified on 3/30/2021 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less