This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:11:19 (UTC).

County Mutual Insurance Company v. Wespac Construction Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 County Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Wespac Construction Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05843

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Maximum Fire Protection LLC

Wespac Construction Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Frank Urman

Attorney at DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy PC - Tucson

2525 E Broadway Blvd., Ste. 200

Tucson, AZ 85716-5300

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan D Pont

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

40 N Central Ave., Ste. 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Donald L Myles, Jr.

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

40 N Central Ave., Ste. 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#14

(#14) * MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Urman, Gary) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/11/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

12 #1

Consent Form

#12

(#12) Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Maximum Fire Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

7 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17749155. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5843-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 1/22/20. (GMP) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Maximum Fire Protection LLC, Wespac Construction Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Maximum Fire Protection LLC.(Pont, Ryan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) * MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Urman, Gary) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 2/11/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 1/22/20. (GMP) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Maximum Fire Protection LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Maximum Fire Protection LLC.(Pont, Ryan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#10) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Maximum Fire Protection LLC, Wespac Construction Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the AUTOMATED CIVIL COVER SHEET when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17749155. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5843-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Submitted by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17749155 filed by County Mutual Insurance Company. (Urman, Gary) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.