This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2021 at 08:30:30 (UTC).

County Board of Arlington County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 County Board of Arlington County, Virginia filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mallinckrodt PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45078

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Mylan Institutional Inc.

Express Scripts Holding Company

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Insource, Inc.

OptumRX, Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic

Caremark, L.L.C.

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Edgar Spivey

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles

150 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510

Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.

Attorney at Kaufman & Canoles

P.O. Box 3037

Norfolk, VA 23514

Grant Edward Morris

Attorney at Sanford Heisler

1666 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20009

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin C. Block

Attorney at Covington & Burling

One City Center, 850 10Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Rebecca C. Mandel

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US - Washington

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jon Myer Talotta

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

9Th Floor, 7930 Jones Branch Drive

Mclean, VA 22102

Emily Munro Scott

Attorney at Hirschler Fleischer

2100 E. Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23223

Sarah Byer Miller

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims

150 Third Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

Michael Willis Smith

Attorney at Christian and Barton

909 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3095

Samuel Perry Coburn

Attorney at Christian and Barton

909 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Paul Christopher Kuhnel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

310 First Street, Suite 405

Roanoke, VA 24011

Turner A. Broughton

Attorney at Williams Mullen

Two James Center, 17Th Floor, 1021 East Cary Street

Richmond, VA 23218

James Kevin Fee

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis, Bockius

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Wells Huntington Byrnes

Attorney at Byrnes Gould

312 Main Street, P.O. Box 47

Danville, VA 24543

Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Emily W. Booth

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Washington

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Other Attorneys

Brent Ryan Gary

Attorney at Reed Smith

3110 Fairview Park Drive

Falls Church, VA 22042

Thomas M. Trucksess

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

17Th Floor, 8350 Broad Street

Tysons, VA 22102

Justin Michael Sizemore

Attorney at Reed Smith

1900 Riverfront Plaza - West Tower, 901 East Byrd Street

Richmond, VA 23219-4069

Jonathan Patrick Floyd

Attorney at Troutman Sanders

1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#78

(#78) Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order directing that this case be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#77

(#77) ORDER of USCA as to #59 Notice of Appeal, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. The court denies the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#76

(#76) Temporary Stay of Mandate under FRAP 41(b) from USCA re #59 Notice of Appeal, : (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#75

(#75) USCA JUDGMENT as to #59 Notice of Appeal, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (kgall) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#74

(#74) Published Opinion of USCA decided on 5/3/2021 in re #59 Notice of Appeal - reversed and remanded.(kgall) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#73

(#73) ORDER that the Clerk execute the Remand Orders [Docs. 54, 58] and Judgment [Doc. 55] by mailing a certified copy of the Remand Orders and Judgment to the clerk of the Circuit Court of Arlington County, Virginia, together with the appropriate case file (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/26/20. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#59

(#71) ORDER of USCA as to #59 Notice of Appeal, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. Upon consideration of submissions relative to the appellants motion for stay pending appeal, without expressing any view on the merits of the appeal, the court denies the motion. Entered at the direction of Judge Quattlebaum with the concurrence of Judge Niemeyer and Judge King. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia Notice of Related Case (Morris, Grant) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. of filing of corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) Modified on 11/14/2019 Counsel refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 4 (klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 1:19-cv-01446. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order directing that this case be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER of USCA as to #59 Notice of Appeal, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. The court denies the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Temporary Stay of Mandate under FRAP 41(b) from USCA re #59 Notice of Appeal, : (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) USCA JUDGMENT as to #59 Notice of Appeal, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. In accordance with the decision of this court, the judgment of the district court is reversed. This case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the court's decision. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. (kgall) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Published Opinion of USCA decided on 5/3/2021 in re #59 Notice of Appeal - reversed and remanded.(kgall) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER that the Clerk execute the Remand Orders [Docs. 54, 58] and Judgment [Doc. 55] by mailing a certified copy of the Remand Orders and Judgment to the clerk of the Circuit Court of Arlington County, Virginia, together with the appropriate case file (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/26/20. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia Notice of Supplemental Information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Fourth Circuit Order Denying Stay)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER of USCA as to #59 Notice of Appeal, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. Upon consideration of submissions relative to the appellants motion for stay pending appeal, without expressing any view on the merits of the appeal, the court denies the motion. Entered at the direction of Judge Quattlebaum with the concurrence of Judge Niemeyer and Judge King. (dvanm, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. re #68 Order on Motion to Stay,,,, Notice of Filing (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia Notice of Related Case (Morris, Grant) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. of filing of corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) Modified on 11/14/2019 Counsel refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 4 (klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Circuit Court of Arlington County ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6937222.), filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waivers, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 6, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 6, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3 of 6, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4 of 6, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5 of 6, #8 Exhibit 3 - Part 6 of 6, #9 Exhibit 4 - Civil Cover with attachment)(Scott, Emily) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (NO ANSWER FILED) (klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 6/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia is a litigant

Latest cases where CAREMARKPCS, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. is a litigant