This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:16:21 (UTC).

County Board of Arlington County, Virginia et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 County Board of Arlington County, Virginia filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against McKinsey Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05294

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

County Board of Arlington County, Virginia

Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors

Chesterfield County, VA

Prince William County Board of Supervisors

Loudoun County, Virginia

Henrico County, VA

City of Roanoke, Virginia

Roanoke County, Virginia

Fauquier County Virginia

City of Bristol, Virginia

City of Salem, Virginia

Alleghany County, Virginia

Accomack County, Virginia

Northumberland County, Virginia

City of Lexington, Virginia

Franklin County, Virginia

Frederick County, Virginia

Halifax County, Virginia

Rockbridge County, Virginia

Dickenson County

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin H. Sharp

Attorney at Sanford Heisler Sharp LLP

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3100

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:21-op-45072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#2

(#2) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (P,R) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Mckinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10854526.. Filed by Accomack County, Virginia, Alleghany County, Virginia, Amherst County, Virginia, Botetourt County, Virginia, Charlotte County, Virginia, Chesterfield County, VA, City of Alexandria, Virginia, City of Bristol, Virginia, City of Buena Vista, Virginia, City of Covington, Virginia, City of Emporia, Virginia, City of Fairfax, Virginia, City of Fredericksburg, Virginia, City of Galax, Virginia, City of Lexington, Virginia, City of Martinsville, Virginia, City of Norton, Virginia, City of Radford, Virginia, City of Roanoke, Virginia, City of Salem, Virginia, City of Waynesboro, Virginia, City of Winchester, Virginia, County Board of Arlington County, Virginia, Culpeper County, Virginia, Cumberland County, Virginia, Dickenson County, Dinwiddie County, Virginia, Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors, Fauquier County Virginia, Floyd County, Virginia, Franklin County, Virginia, Frederick County, Virginia, Giles County, Virginia, Goochland County, Virginia, Greensville County, VA, Halifax County, Virginia, Henrico County, VA, Henry County, Virginia, Isle of Wight County, Virginia, King and Queen County, VA, Lee County, Virginia, Loudoun County, Virginia, Louisa County, Virginia, Madison County, Virginia, Mecklenburg County, Virginia, Montgomery County, Virginia, Northampton County, VA, Northumberland County, Virginia, Page County, Virginia, Patrick County, Virginia, Pittsylvania County, Virginia, Prince George County, Virginia, Prince William County Board of Supervisors, Roanoke County, Virginia, Rockbridge County, Virginia, Shenandoah County, Virginia, Stafford County, Virginia, Washington County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sharp, Kevin) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Northern District of Ohio, 1:21-op-45072-DAP, County Board of Arlington County, Virginia v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-05294-CRB pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 2 cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:21-op-45072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (P,R) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Mckinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10854526.. Filed by Accomack County, Virginia, Alleghany County, Virginia, Amherst County, Virginia, Botetourt County, Virginia, Charlotte County, Virginia, Chesterfield County, VA, City of Alexandria, Virginia, City of Bristol, Virginia, City of Buena Vista, Virginia, City of Covington, Virginia, City of Emporia, Virginia, City of Fairfax, Virginia, City of Fredericksburg, Virginia, City of Galax, Virginia, City of Lexington, Virginia, City of Martinsville, Virginia, City of Norton, Virginia, City of Radford, Virginia, City of Roanoke, Virginia, City of Salem, Virginia, City of Waynesboro, Virginia, City of Winchester, Virginia, County Board of Arlington County, Virginia, Culpeper County, Virginia, Cumberland County, Virginia, Dickenson County, Dinwiddie County, Virginia, Fairfax County Board Of Supervisors, Fauquier County Virginia, Floyd County, Virginia, Franklin County, Virginia, Frederick County, Virginia, Giles County, Virginia, Goochland County, Virginia, Greensville County, VA, Halifax County, Virginia, Henrico County, VA, Henry County, Virginia, Isle of Wight County, Virginia, King and Queen County, VA, Lee County, Virginia, Loudoun County, Virginia, Louisa County, Virginia, Madison County, Virginia, Mecklenburg County, Virginia, Montgomery County, Virginia, Northampton County, VA, Northumberland County, Virginia, Page County, Virginia, Patrick County, Virginia, Pittsylvania County, Virginia, Prince George County, Virginia, Prince William County Board of Supervisors, Roanoke County, Virginia, Rockbridge County, Virginia, Shenandoah County, Virginia, Stafford County, Virginia, Washington County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Sharp, Kevin) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Henrico County is a litigant

Latest cases where Chesterfield County is a litigant

Latest cases where The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia is a litigant

Latest cases where Loudoun County, Virginia is a litigant