Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2020 at 11:13:08 (UTC).

Countryside Bank v. Central Market of Indiana, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Countryside Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Central Market of Indiana, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James T Moody and John E Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00256

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James T Moody

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Countryside Bank

6734 Joliet Road

Countryside, IL 60525

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Central Market of Indiana, Inc.

3232 Central Avenue

Lake Station, IN 46405

Bushra Naseer

M.R. Allah LLC

Zafar Sheikh

Naser Musleh

3232 Central Avenue LLC

Unknown Owners & Non-Record Claimants

Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc

Wilshire Bank

Hasan Musleh

Bashir Chaudry

Sean Z Sheikh Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Nancy J Townsend

Attorney at Krieg DeVault LLP - Mer/IN

8001 Broadway Ste 400

Merrillville, IN 46410

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Henry Nasif Mahmoud PHV

Attorney at McKenzie Wilkes and Mahmoud

4800 S Park Ave

Chicago, IL 60615

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE by Central Market of Indiana, Inc. re #22 Response to Motion (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

22 #1

Exhibit

#22

(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Expenses filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Central Market of Indiana, Inc. re #20 Reply to Response to Motion (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

20 #1

Exhibit

#20

(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel, #13 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

(#15) First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#13

(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel, #13 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#9

(#9) First MOTION to Amend/Correct AND ANSWER by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#8

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION stay briefing by Plaintiff Countryside Bank #8 . GRANTING with different relief than requested, #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc. The deadline to file a response to the motion to remand, and any responses to the crossmotions for sanctions, is 8/17/2020. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 8/12/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Henry N. Mahmoud for Central Market of Indiana, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/16/2020. (ace) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#6

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Henry N. Mahmoud for Central Market of Indiana, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/16/2020. (ace) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Expenses filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy J Townsend on behalf of Countryside Bank (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) First COUNTERCLAIM AND ANSWER against Countryside Bank, filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4275944.) from Lake Superior Court East Chicago Indiana, Cause No. 45D02-1712-MF-00218, filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc..(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by Central Market of Indiana, Inc. re #22 Response to Motion (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Expenses filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by Central Market of Indiana, Inc. re #20 Reply to Response to Motion (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel, #13 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION stay briefing by Plaintiff Countryside Bank #8 . GRANTING with different relief than requested, #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc. The deadline to file a response to the motion to remand, and any responses to the crossmotions for sanctions, is 8/17/2020. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 8/12/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel filed by Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Central Market of Indiana, Inc. re #15 First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION stay briefing filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First MOTION for Sanctions Banks Counsel by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION stay briefing by Plaintiff Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION to Amend/Correct AND ANSWER by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Henry N. Mahmoud for Central Market of Indiana, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/16/2020. (ace) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Attorney Henry Nasif Mahmoud to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Central Market of Indiana, Inc et al. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4278861(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Expenses by Counter Defendant Countryside Bank, Plaintiff Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy J Townsend on behalf of Countryside Bank (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketRelated Case Remark - This case is related to Case No. 2:18CV347 TLS-JEM. Counsel did not submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This case was found when searching for attorneys PHV record. (kjp) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSenior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (kjp) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First COUNTERCLAIM AND ANSWER against Countryside Bank, filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4275944.) from Lake Superior Court East Chicago Indiana, Cause No. 45D02-1712-MF-00218, filed by Central Market of Indiana, Inc..(Mahmoud PHV, Henry) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE STATE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATED WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant