This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 09:51:16 (UTC).

Country Pure Foods, LLC v. Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Country Pure Foods, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02574

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Country Pure Foods, LLC

Defendants

Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc.

Kathryn Bernell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel B. Webb

Attorney at Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland

2800 Bp Tower, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Christopher R. Butler

Attorney at Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland

2800 Bp Tower, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Defendant Attorneys

Vincent J. Michalec

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland

2300 Bp Tower, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph H. Dimont

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

35Th Floor, 101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael S. Weinstein

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland

2300 Bp Tower, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Laura M. Franco

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

35Th Floor, 101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #1

Affidavit of Joseph Dimont

#9

8 #1

Affidavit of Laura Franco

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H-REBLEND Office Action Response

1 #5

Exhibit E-REBLEND Application and TSDR

1 #4

Exhibit D-V BLEND Section 15 Notice of Acknowledgement

1 #3

Exhibit C-V BLEND Registration Certificate

1 #2

Exhibit B-V BLEND Office Action Response

1 #1

Exhibit A-V BLEND Application and TSDR

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Defense Counsels' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Laura M. Franco and Joseph H. Dimont for Kathryn Bernell and Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 ) & (Related Doc #9 ). Judge John R. Adams on 1/14/21.(K,C) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney Appearance by Vincent J. Michalec filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Michalec, Vincent) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for attorney Joseph L. Dimont to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10565731, filed by Kathryn Bernell, Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Dimont)(Weinstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for attorney Laura M. Franco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10565594, filed by Kathryn Bernell, Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Laura Franco)(Weinstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Weinstein filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Weinstein, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Country Pure Foods, LLC. Kathryn Bernell waiver sent on 11/16/2020, answer due 1/15/2021 filed on behalf of Country Pure Foods, LLC (Webb, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Country Pure Foods, LLC. Re-Harvest Provisions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/16/2020, answer due 1/15/2021 filed on behalf of Country Pure Foods, LLC (Webb, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Country Pure Foods, LLC. (Webb, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Country Pure Foods, LLC. (Webb, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10424402.. Filed by Country Pure Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V BLEND Application and TSDR, #2 Exhibit B-V BLEND Office Action Response, #3 Exhibit C-V BLEND Registration Certificate, #4 Exhibit D-V BLEND Section 15 Notice of Acknowledgement, #5 Exhibit E-REBLEND Application and TSDR, #6 Exhibit F-Cease and Desist Letter, #7 Exhibit G-REBLEND Entity Conversion, #8 Exhibit H-REBLEND Office Action Response, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Webb, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R. Butler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel B. Webb