This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 07:26:48 (UTC).

Councill v. Ecolab, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Councill filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ecolab, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler, Jennifer A. Dorsey and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01889

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judges

Brenda Weksler

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Councill

Defendant

Ecolab, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dana Sniegocki

Attorney at HKM Employment Attorneys LLP

1785 East Saharasuite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Jenny L Foley

Attorney at HKM EMPLOYMENT ATTORNEYS LLP

1785 East Saharasuite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Defendant Attorney

Deverie J. Christensen

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

300 S. Fourth Street, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

(#4) STIPULATION to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Arbitration by Defendant Ecolab, Inc.. (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ecolab, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Arbitration. The Clerk of Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Any party who desires to seek further action in this case will first have to file a motion to reopen it. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Administratively Closed. (DRS) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Arbitration. The Clerk of Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Any party who desires to seek further action in this case will first have to file a motion to reopen it. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:21-cv-01889-JAD-BNW. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ecolab, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/3/2021. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah recuses herself in this action. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration and Stay Action Pending Arbitration by Defendant Ecolab, Inc.. (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ecolab, Inc. (DRS) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jennifer Councill. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sniegocki, Dana) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ecolab, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6662705) by Jennifer Councill. Proof of service due by 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Sniegocki, Dana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ECOLAB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deverie J. Christensen