This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2020 at 09:20:01 (UTC).

Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. v. Devos et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Devos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02310

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.

Petitioner

The Council of the Great City Schools

Defendants

Elisabeth D. Devos

U.S. Department of Education

William Barr

Robert K. Hur

Amicus Curiae

U.S. House of Representatives

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Brian Busey

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Ave Nw Ste 6000

Washington, DC 20006

Seth M Galanter

Attorney at National Center for Youth Law

1313 L St. Nw Ste. 130

Washington, DC 20005

Jessica L Grant

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market St.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rachel Velcoff Hults

Attorney at National Center for Youth Law

1212 Broadway Ste. 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Alice Y Abrokwa

Attorney at National Center for Youth Law

1313 L St. Nw Ste. 130

Washington, DC 20005

Jack Williford Londen

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market St.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Petitioner Attorneys

Aleksandra Rushing

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza Ste. 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Paige G Duggins-Clay

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Ave. Ste. 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Steven A Neeley, Jr

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

750 17Th St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20006

Shmuel Benzion Shulman

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza Ste. 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Mary Deweese

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

120 South Riverside Plaza Ste. 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

John Borkowski

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

120 S. Riverside Plaza St. 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Douglas Letter

219 Cannon Hob

Washington, DC 20515

 

Court Documents

#33

27 #2

Certificate Of Service

27 #1

Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order

#27

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase Stayed (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/14/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shmuel Shulman. Directing attorney Shmuel Shulman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Aleksandra Rushing. Directing attorney Aleksandra Rushing to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paige C Duggins-Clay. Directing attorney Paige C Duggins-Clay to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mary Deweese. Directing attorney Mary Deweese to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Borkowski. Directing attorney John Borkowski to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION And Proposed Order Granting 30-Day Stay Of Proceedings by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order, #2 Certificate Of Service)(Londen, Jack) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by U.S. House of Representatives (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shmuel Shulman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8854560.) by The Council of the Great City Schools(Neeley, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica L Grant. Directing attorney Jessica L Grant to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jack W Londen. Directing attorney Jack W Londen to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued 60 days as to Elisabeth D. Devos, U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel E. M. Velcoff Hults (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8800598.) by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 page 2 of PHV Motion)(Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alice Y. Abrokwa (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8800150.) by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.(Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Seth M. Galanter (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8800122.) by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.(Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica L. Grant (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8800091.) by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.(Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jack W. Londen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8800081.) by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.(Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc. (Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Set Aside a Regulation and for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Elisabeth D. Devos, U.S. Department of Education ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8799866.), filed by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Busey, George) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNCIL OF PARENT ATTORNEYS AND ADVOCATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES is a litigant