This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

Coulton v. Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Coulton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Rodriguez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hilda G Tagle and B Janice Ellington. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00060

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Hilda G Tagle

Referral Judge

B Janice Ellington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachary Coulton

Sinton, TX 78387

Defendant

MaryAnn Rodriguez

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Order

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Coulton re: #6 Order to Show Cause, filed. (ocasas, 7) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Zachary Coulton.(AnnSalazar, 2) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Zachary Coulton. Submit certified copy of the trust fund account statement Parties notified. Notice of Compliance due by 3/25/2019, filed. (AnnSalazar, 2) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Zachary Coulton, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (AnnSalazar, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2019: #1 Order) (AnnSalazar, 2). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Zachary Coulton re: #6 Order to Show Cause, filed. (ocasas, 7) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Zachary Coulton. Submit certified copy of the trust fund account statement Parties notified. Notice of Compliance due by 3/25/2019, filed. (AnnSalazar, 2) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) **Entered in Error-Wrong Event used. See below for correct entry.**Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Zachary Coulton, filed. (AnnSalazar, 2) Modified on 2/21/2019 (AnnSalazar, 2). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AnnSalazar, 2) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Zachary Coulton, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019. (AnnSalazar, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2019: #1 Order) (AnnSalazar, 2). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Zachary Coulton.(AnnSalazar, 2) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.