This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:15:26 (UTC).

COULTER v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 COULTER filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01814

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMSEY COULTER

Defendant

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLAS J. LINKER

Attorney at ZEMEL LAW LLC

1373 Broad St., Suite 203-C

Clifton, NJ 07013

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN A. VOGT

Attorney at JONES DAY

3161 Michelson Dr Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

WILLIAM R. TAYLOR

Attorney at JONES DAY

717 Texas Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

RICHARD J. GRABOWSKI

Attorney at JONES DAY

3161 Michelson Dr Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

The Curtis Center, Suite 400E, 170 S. Independence Mall, W.

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3337

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF JOHN A. VOGT, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/21/20.5/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. "NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS. (ECF FORM NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY)(kw, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF RICHARD J. GRABOWSKI, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/21/20.5/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. "NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY" (kw, ) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF WILLIAM R. TAYLOR, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/21/20.5/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. "NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY" (ECF FORM NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEY)(kw, ) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice John A. Vogt, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14304274.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel; certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Richard J. Grabowski, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14304273.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel; certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice William R. Taylor, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14304272.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel; certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. TIME TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 6/24/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/18/20. 5/18/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. E-Mailed To: Nicholas J. Linker on 4/10/20. (fdc) Modified on 5/19/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by RAMSEY COULTER. (lisad, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14222906.), filed by RAMSEY COULTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(LINKER, NICHOLAS) Modified on 5/19/2020 (lisad, ). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Joseph Grabowski Esquire

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Vogt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Roquemore Taylor