This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2019 at 07:22:15 (UTC).

COULSTON et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 COULSTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02060

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Walter Coulston, Sr.

STELLA D. COULSTON

Defendants

JOHN DOE, 2

WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karl J. Protil, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Janice Lynn Cole

Nimalan Amirthalingam

Matthew Mawn Davey

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #3

Exhibit DVD

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE, 2, WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Cole, Janice) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by September 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Janice) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OPPOSITION filed by STELLA D. COULSTON, WALTER COULSTON, SR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Protil, Karl) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mawn Davey on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Davey, Matthew) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Cole, Janice) Modified event title on 8/12/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE, 2, WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit DVD)(Cole, Janice) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Protil, Karl) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6247786) filed by Stella D. Coulston, Individually, and as a Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter E. Coulston, Jr., Walter Coulston, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Protil, Karl) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less