This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 09:52:15 (UTC).

COUCHMAN v. Ohio Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 COUCHMAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ohio Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11035

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARA COUCHMAN

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance

Ohio Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul F. Doherty

Attorney at Johnson Law, PLC

Buhl Building, 535 Griswold Street, Suite 2632

Detroit, MI 48230

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie M. Brochert

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Ave

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Charles W. Browning

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-5097

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Stipulated Order Amending Case Caption to Correct Name of Defendant. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (SSch) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/6/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/24/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MLan) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 5/30/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Liberty Mutual Insurance (Brochert, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Brochert, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Notice of Removal. Response due by 4/26/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Browning on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Browning, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 4/25/2019 (DAll) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

1 #2

B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 2019-002746-CK. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 2017-016899-NO, Judge David J. Allen] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B) (Brochert, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Stipulated Order Amending Case Caption to Correct Name of Defendant. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (SSch) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/6/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/24/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MLan) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 5/30/2019. Counsel to submit stipulated order setting briefing schedule. (MLan) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 5/30/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Liberty Mutual Insurance (Brochert, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Brochert, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Liberty Mutual Insurance - Receipt No. DET121988 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Notice of Removal. Response due by 4/26/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Browning on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Browning, Charles) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 4/25/2019 (DAll) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 2019-002746-CK. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 2017-016899-NO, Judge David J. Allen] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B) (Brochert, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Security Insuance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie M. Brochert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles W. Browning