This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2021 at 12:11:35 (UTC).

Couamin v. Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Couamin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02470

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skye Couamin

Defendants

Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation

Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Green

Attorney at Cambre & Associates, LLC

Suite 300, 2310 Parklake Drive

Atlanta, GA 30345

Cassie Derice Preston

Attorney at Cambre & Associates, LLC

Suite 300, 2310 Parklake Drive

Atlanta, GA 30345

Defendant Attorneys

Paul A. Grote

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham LLP

Suite 3500, 303 Peachtree St. N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308

G. Randall Moody

Attorney at Drew Eckl & Farnham - ATL

Suite 3500, 303 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 3, 2021, September 7, 2021, September 30, 2021, October 4, 2021, October 8, 2021, October 11, 2021, October 21, 2021, October 29, 2021, November 3, 2021, November 10, 2021, November 17, 2021, November 24, 2021, November 29, 2021, December 8, 2021, December 13, 2021, December 28, 2021, December 30, 2021, January 4, 2022, by G. Randall Moody. (Moody, G.) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#11

(#11) Initial Disclosures by Skye Couamin.(Preston, Cassie) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#10

(#10) Initial Disclosures by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Before the Court is the parties' Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (Dkt. #6 ) (the Plan). Having considered the Plan, it is hereby APPROVED. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/21/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#8

(#8) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Cassie Derice Preston replacing attorney Rachel Green. (Preston, Cassie) Modified on 7/14/2021 QC email sent re signatures(tmf). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants First Request For Production Of Documents To Plaintiff, Defendants First Interrogatories To Plaintiff, And First Request For Admissions Of Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, And Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation To Plaintiff by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#6

(#6) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Coast Factory Investments Holdings, Inc. for Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 1, 2021, July 5, 2021, July 6, 2021, July 28, 2021, July 30, 2021, August 2, 2021, August 3, 2021, August 4, 2021, August 9, 2021, August 11, 2021, August 13, 2021, August 16, 2021, August 23, 2021, August 30, 2021, September 3, 2021, September 6, 2021, September 7, 2021, September 8, 2021, September 30, 2021, October 4, 2021, October 7, 2021, October 8, 2021, October 11, 2021, October 29, 2021, November 24, 2021, November 29, 2021, December 13, 2021, December 28, 2021, December 30, 2021, by G. Randall Moody. (Moody, G.) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt) (Entered: 06/20/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit -C -Defendant Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit -B - Notice of Removal -STATE

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Plaintiff Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11047091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Plaintiff Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B - Notice of Removal -STATE, #3 Exhibit -C -Defendant Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 3, 2021, September 7, 2021, September 30, 2021, October 4, 2021, October 8, 2021, October 11, 2021, October 21, 2021, October 29, 2021, November 3, 2021, November 10, 2021, November 17, 2021, November 24, 2021, November 29, 2021, December 8, 2021, December 13, 2021, December 28, 2021, December 30, 2021, January 4, 2022, by G. Randall Moody. (Moody, G.) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Initial Disclosures by Skye Couamin.(Preston, Cassie) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Disclosures by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Before the Court is the parties' Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (Dkt. #6 ) (the Plan). Having considered the Plan, it is hereby APPROVED. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/21/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Cassie Derice Preston replacing attorney Rachel Green. (Preston, Cassie) Modified on 7/14/2021 QC email sent re signatures(tmf). (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants First Request For Production Of Documents To Plaintiff, Defendants First Interrogatories To Plaintiff, And First Request For Admissions Of Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, And Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation To Plaintiff by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Coast Factory Investments Holdings, Inc. for Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Moody, G.) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 1, 2021, July 5, 2021, July 6, 2021, July 28, 2021, July 30, 2021, August 2, 2021, August 3, 2021, August 4, 2021, August 9, 2021, August 11, 2021, August 13, 2021, August 16, 2021, August 23, 2021, August 30, 2021, September 3, 2021, September 6, 2021, September 7, 2021, September 8, 2021, September 30, 2021, October 4, 2021, October 7, 2021, October 8, 2021, October 11, 2021, October 29, 2021, November 24, 2021, November 29, 2021, December 13, 2021, December 28, 2021, December 30, 2021, by G. Randall Moody. (Moody, G.) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt) (Entered: 06/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11047091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Plaintiff Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B - Notice of Removal -STATE, #3 Exhibit -C -Defendant Pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION is a litigant