This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:39:13 (UTC).

Frederick Cottrell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Frederick Cottrell filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. Frederick G Cottrell

Frederick Cottrell

Defendants

Social Security Administration

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy Dana Monge

Attorney at Law Offices of Martin Taller APC

2300 East Katella Avenue Suite 440

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant Attorneys

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Tina Naicker

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Assistant US Attorney SA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

411 West 4Th Street Suite 8000

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4599

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frederick Cottrell, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 1/15/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F DelaRosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Yania Llamas. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV20-18 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Frederick Cottrell. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Frederick G Cottrell. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frederick G Cottrell, (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frederick G Cottrell. (Monge, Troy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25060023 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Frederick G Cottrell. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Frederick G Cottrell(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less