This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:00:21 (UTC).

COTTON v. ZATECKY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 COTTON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against ZATECKY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04816

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VELTOR COTTON

Pendleton, IN 46064

Respondent

DUSHAN ZATECKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Natalie Faye Weiss

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 West Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner VELTOR COTTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Transaction History)(REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) ORDER DIRECTING SEVERANCE OF HABEAS CLAIMS - Veltor Cotton's amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his conviction in four separate prison disciplinary proceedings. Dkt. 6. Each disciplinary action has the status of a separate "court" proceeding for purposes of habeas review. Although there may be common claims, the proceedings must be challenged separately. The clerk is directed to open three new habeas actions in the Indianapolis Division--one for each of the following three disciplinary proceedings. All four actions shall be linked to one another on the docket. (See Order.) Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/6/2019.(REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Faye Weiss on behalf of Respondent DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Weiss, Natalie) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#2

(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by VELTOR COTTON. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit - Offender Transaction History

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2020. MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by VELTOR COTTON is granted. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/2/2020 (dist made)(CBU) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by VELTOR COTTON. (NAD) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Faye Weiss on behalf of Respondent DUSHAN ZATECKY. (Weiss, Natalie) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2020. MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by VELTOR COTTON is granted. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 1/2/2020 (dist made)(CBU) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by VELTOR COTTON. (NAD) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner VELTOR COTTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Offender Transaction History)(REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by VELTOR COTTON. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER DIRECTING SEVERANCE OF HABEAS CLAIMS - Veltor Cotton's amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his conviction in four separate prison disciplinary proceedings. Dkt. 6. Each disciplinary action has the status of a separate "court" proceeding for purposes of habeas review. Although there may be common claims, the proceedings must be challenged separately. The clerk is directed to open three new habeas actions in the Indianapolis Division--one for each of the following three disciplinary proceedings. All four actions shall be linked to one another on the docket. (See Order.) Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/6/2019.(REO) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less