This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:56:38 (UTC).

COTTON v. STELLANTIS D/B/A FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 COTTON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against STELLANTIS D/B/A FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Cotton

Defendant

Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Lee Hitchcock

Attorney at Law Office of Jennifer L. Hitchcock

116 E. Berry Street, Suite 625

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Michael Middleton

Attorney at Law Office of Jennifer Hitchcock

116 E. Berry St., Ste 625

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary A. Ahonen

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC (Indianapolis)

211 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michael W. Padgett

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC (Indianapolis)

211 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Appearance of Jennifer Hitchcock

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Padgett on behalf of Defendant Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Ahonen on behalf of Defendant Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Ahonen, Zachary) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by MARK COTTON. (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant STELLANTIS D/B/A FCA US LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#8

(#8) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2022 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/24/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by STELLANTIS D/B/A FCA US LLC.(Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for March 14, 2022 to April 18, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/25/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sua sponte now RESCHEDULES the Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for March 14, 2022 to April 18, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/25/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by STELLANTIS D/B/A FCA US LLC.(Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2022 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/24/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MRI) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant STELLANTIS D/B/A FCA US LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by MARK COTTON. (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Ahonen on behalf of Defendant Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Ahonen, Zachary) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Padgett on behalf of Defendant Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Padgett, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Howard Superior Court, case number 34D02-2112-CT-003335, filed by Stellantis d/b/a FCA US LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6928214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Appearance of Jennifer Hitchcock, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Padgett, Michael) Modified on 1/18/2022 (duplicate docket text removed) (DJH). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W Padgett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary A. Ahonen