This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 07:05:35 (UTC).

Cotton et al v. Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Cotton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00261

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza

Sirdina Isaac-Joseph

Beecher Cotton

Sylvia Browne

Pamela Colon

Esther Clifford

And all others similarly situated

Defendants

EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC

Freepoint Commodities, LLC

Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC

John Doe

Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC

Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC

BP Products North America

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

John Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee J Rohn

Attorney at Lee J. Rohn & Associates

1101 King Street

St. Croix, VI 00820

Dena R Young

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 360019103

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John Albanese

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1229 Tyler Street Nesuite 205

Minneapolis, MN 55413

John Quin Kerrigan, I

129 E. Ashland Street

Doylestown, PA 18901

Rhea Lawrence

Attorney at Rohn & Carpenter

1101 King Street

Christinatsed, VI 00820

Shanon Jude Carson

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Streetsuite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Nicholas Marinelli

Attorney at Bolt Nagi PC

Merchant Financial Center 4608 Tutu Park Mall Suite 202

St. Thomas, VI 00802-1735

J. Daryl Dodson

Attorney at Moore, Dodson and Russell

Suite 310

St Thomas, VI 00802

Charles Edward Lockwood

Attorney at Nichols, Newman, Logan & Gray P.C.

1131 King Stste 24

Christiansted, VI 00820

Daniel T. Donovan

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Holly Trogdon

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Matthew Owen

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Xavier J Avery

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

609 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Gregg R Kronenberger

Attorney at Dudley Newman Feuerzeig, LLP

1311 King Streetsuite 204

Christiansted, VI 00820

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

Kevin J. Bruno

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1271 Avenue Of Americas

New York, NY 10020

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Schuyler A Smith

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel LLP

150 Southeast Second Avenuesuite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Andres Pino

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Southeast 2Nd Avenueste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Jennifer Quildon Brooks

Attorney at Hanilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Se Second Aveste. 1200

Miami, FL 33131

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

120 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#120

#119

#118

RESTRICTED

117 #10

Exhibit 10

117 #7

Exhibit 7

117 #4

Exhibit 4

117 #1

Exhibit 1

#100

#2

1 #7

Exhibit E - Other docket entries

1 #6

Exhibit D - Emergency TRO

1 #5

Exhibit C - Notices of appearance

1 #4

Exhibit B - Notice of service

1 #3

Exhibit A - Summons and complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Consent to removal

#1

301 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) NOTICE to the Court Re: Continuation of Stay of Virgin Islands Class Action Suits by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) NOTICE of Appearance by Andres Pino on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America (Pino, Andres) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7-15-21, before Judge Wilma A. Lewis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindsay DeWaide, Telephone number 340-712-7112. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2021. (Dewaide, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) MEMORANDUM in Support re #100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (WAL) dated 07/16/2021 SUMMARIZING the issues addressed at the July 15, 2021 oral argument in this matter; EMBODYING the Court's rulings to date; DISCUSSING the current status of the proceedings; MEMORIALIZING the upcoming deadlines. #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Rohn, Lee) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #114 Response,, Event and PDF don't Match Counsel need to re-file correctly. (TNS) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) NOTICE Re 14 Day Stay by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Order) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bruno on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Bruno, Kevin) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Response re #29 Reply to, filed by Plaintiffs And all others similarly situated, Sylvia Browne, Esther Clifford, Pamela Colon, Beecher Cotton, Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza, Sirdina Isaac-Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Text of Proposed Order 18) (Rohn, Lee) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) MEMORANDUM in Support re #112 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiffs And all others similarly situated, Sylvia Browne, Esther Clifford, Pamela Colon, Beecher Cotton, Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza, Sirdina Isaac-Joseph. (Rohn, Lee) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs And all others similarly situated, Sylvia Browne, Esther Clifford, Pamela Colon, Beecher Cotton, Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza, Sirdina Isaac-Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Rohn, Lee) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lee J Rohn on behalf of Plaintiffs Sylvia Browne, Esther Clifford, Pamela Colon, Beecher Cotton, Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza, Sirdina Isaac-Joseph (Rohn, Lee) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Schuyler A Smith on behalf of Defendant BP Products North America (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Filer is advised to refile the Notice of Removal listing all Plaintiffs and Defendants in the captionRe: #1 Notice of Removal. (W, K) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Sylvia Browne, Pamela Colon, Beecher Cotton, Alvina Jean-Marie Ilarraza, Sirdina Isaac-Joseph from VI Superior Court St Croix Division, case number SX-2021-CV-00414. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942366)filed by Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent to removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Notice of service, #5 Exhibit C - Notices of appearance, #6 Exhibit D - Emergency TRO, #7 Exhibit E - Other docket entries) (Kronenberger, Gregg) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where All Others Similarly Situated is a litigant