This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2020 at 08:09:51 (UTC).

Cotnoir et al v. Stull et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Cotnoir filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Stull. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pauline Delabruere

Francine Cotnoir

Defendants

Jonathan Stull

MCT Transportation LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

Brandon Gottschall

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Jonathan Stull.(Gottschall, Brandon) Modified on 2/21/2020 to edit filer (alew, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by MCT Transportation LLC.(Gottschall, Brandon) Modified on 2/21/2020 to edit filer (alew, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by MCT Transportation LLC.(Gottschall, Brandon) Modified on 2/13/2020 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by MCT Transportation LLC.(alew, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-42-00102. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8945501), filed by MCT Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) Modified on 2/13/2020 to correct filer (alew, ). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Jonathan Stull.(Gottschall, Brandon) Modified on 2/21/2020 to edit filer (alew, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended ANSWER to Complaint by MCT Transportation LLC.(Gottschall, Brandon) Modified on 2/21/2020 to edit filer (alew, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by MCT Transportation LLC.(Gottschall, Brandon) Modified on 2/13/2020 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by MCT Transportation LLC.(alew, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-42-00102. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8945501), filed by MCT Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) Modified on 2/13/2020 to correct filer (alew, ). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCT Transportation, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Gottschall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Steven Barrow