This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2020 at 09:48:30 (UTC).

Cothran v. Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Cothran filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02297

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saul Cothran

Defendant

Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Jack L. Townsend, Sr.

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle James Lee

Attorney at Lee Law, PLLC

1971 W Lumsden Rd Ste 303

Brandon, FL 33511

William John Gadd

Attorney at W. John Gadd, Attorney at Law

Suite 250, 2727 Ulmerton Rd

Clearwater, FL 33762

Defendant Attorneys

Roger William Feicht

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA

Suite 500 E, 777 S Flagler Dr

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6194

Eduardo Alberto Suarez-Solar

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA

401 E Jackson St Ste 2500

Tampa, FL 33602-5226

Jounice Laverne Nealy-Brown

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA

401 E Jackson St Ste 2500

Tampa, FL 33602-5226

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jack Light Townsend, Sr.

Attorney at Law Office of Jack L. Townsend, Sr, PA

6408 E Fowler Ave

Tampa, FL 33617

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

#5

#3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ENDORSED ORDER: Electric Supply's motion #6 for a more definite statement is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/20/2020. (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #14--motion for more definite statement; permitting the plaintiff, by 12/11/2020, to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/20/2020. (BK) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on February 25, 2021 at 10:00 am before Jack L. Townsend. (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER re #17--order directing the parties to mediate; directing any party who wishes to appear by video to notify the mediator reasonably in advance. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/12/2020. (BK) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER appointing Jack L. Townsend as mediator; designating Kyle Lee as lead counsel; directing the parties to mediate by 3/5/2021; directing lead counsel to coordinate the date and to file a notice of mediation within seven days of this order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/12/2020. (BK) Modified on 11/12/2020 (BK) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the December 2021 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/10/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gadd, William) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. (Nealy-Brown, Jounice) Modified text on 11/3/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10--motion for an extension of time; extending through 11/2/2020 the time within which the defendant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/19/2020. (BK) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Saul Cothran. (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Amended Complaint by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. (Nealy-Brown, Jounice) Modified on 10/15/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. Related case(s): n (Nealy-Brown, Jounice) Modified on 10/15/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. for Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. (Nealy-Brown, Jounice) Modified on 10/15/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Saul Cothran with Jury Demand. filed by Saul Cothran.(Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Feicht, Roger) Modified on 10/5/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of compliance re #4 Order by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #3--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/1/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-2297-T-23SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 20-CA-006894 filed in State Court on August 28, 2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17370738 filed by Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electric Supply of Tampa, Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Light Townsend, Sr.