This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:04:02 (UTC).

Cothern v. Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Cothern filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03064

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Cothern

Defendants

REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, LLC

Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Jon Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm PLLC

650 South Shackleford, Suite 411, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72023

Chris Burks

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm, PLLC

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72205

Defendant Attorneys

Christian Angotti

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robert W. Pritchard

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.c.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Todd M. Church

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

321 North Clark Street, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 7/23/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#32

(#32) WITHDRAWING Robert W. Pritchard as counsel for Defendant Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC and substituting Todd M. Church as counsel of record (Church, Todd) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion to appear pro hac vice #27 is granted. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#30

(#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terry Cothern by Joshua Jon Sanford (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#29

(#29) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#28

(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC by Todd M. Church (Church, Todd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15802685. (Angotti, Christian) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#26

(#26) MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

25 #1

*Restricted*

8 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/12/19. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for attorney Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5023672) filed by TERRY COTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sanford, Josh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#3

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/11/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) Modified text on 2/11/2019. (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, LLC (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5021723) filed by TERRY COTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 7/23/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) WITHDRAWING Robert W. Pritchard as counsel for Defendant Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC and substituting Todd M. Church as counsel of record (Church, Todd) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion to appear pro hac vice #27 is granted. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terry Cothern by Joshua Jon Sanford (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Reynolds Consumer Products, LLC by Todd M. Church (Church, Todd) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15802685. (Angotti, Christian) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, ) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RECEIVED from Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-00140 (jjr) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion to Change Venue. The Court hereby transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois FORTHWITH. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4-30-19. (nam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Chris Burks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION for attorney Chris Burks to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5032313) filed by TERRY COTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Burks, Chris) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for attorney Chris Burks to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5032313) by TERRY COTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanford, Josh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/12/19. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/11/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) Modified text on 2/11/2019. (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for attorney Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5023672) filed by TERRY COTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sanford, Josh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for attorney Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5023672) by TERRY COTHERN. (Sanford, Josh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, LLC (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5021723) filed by TERRY COTHERN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 5/7/2019.] (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYNOLDS METALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Reynolds Consumer Products LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Sanford