This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:05:49 (UTC).

Coston v. Onondaga County Justice Center et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Coston filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Onondaga County Justice Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glenn T. Suddaby and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glenn T. Suddaby

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rashod Coston

Syracuse, NY 13202

Derrick Harris

Syracuse, NY 13202

Defendants

Onodaga County

Onondaga County Justice Center

Commission of Corrections

Sergeant Okun

State of New York

Fourth Dept. Appellate Division

Liutenant Miller

Sergeant Carsten

Sergeant Lorenzo

Sergeanter Peterson

Cabrey

Eugene Conway

Cross Defendant

Governor Cuomo

 

Court Documents

3 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiffs should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/30/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

5 #1

order

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cabrey, Carsten, Commission of Corrections, Eugene Conway, Cuomo, Fourth Dept. Appellate Division, Lorenzo, Miller, Okun, Onodaga County, Onondaga County Justice Center, Peterson, State of New York. Document filed by Rashod Coston.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#9

(#9) INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Rashod Coston. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#10

(#10) Letter Motion from Rashod Coston. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#4

(#4) DECISION AND ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE as to Plaintiffs Rashod Coston and Derrick Harris: Plaintiffs Coston and Harris must each individually, within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order, either (a) pay the Court's filing fee of $400.00 in full or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application in accordance with this Decision and Order and a signed inmate authorization form reflecting his individual consent to pay the $350.00 filing fee over time, in installments. If, within the time period specified above, Coston or Harris fails to comply with the terms of this Decision and Order delineated above, the non-compliant individual will be terminated from the docket and any claims asserted by that non-compliant individual will be dismissed from the action without prejudice without further Order of this Court. Upon full compliance with this Decision and Order, or at the expiration of the deadline to comply, whichever is earlier, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/13/2020. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 2/12/2020. Case Review Deadline 3/13/2020). (Copy of Decision and Order, a blank IFP application, and blank Inmate Authorization Form served upon Plaintiffs Rashod Coston and Derrick Harris via regular mail) (sal) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #4 Order. Sent to Harris Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order) (nas, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rashod Coston. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Rashod Coston. Old Address: Onondaga County Justice Center. New Address: Elmira Correctional Facility. (Mailing envelope included) (meb) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #4 Order. Sent to Coston Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order) (nas, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-11525. electronically transferred when case opened (Entered: 01/06/2020)

6 #1

order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDkt. No. 11 and referenced documents along with a notice of change of address form served on Coston at Collins C.F. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER : The Court received a letter from plaintiff Rashod Coston on February 28, 2020, related to this action and another action filed by plaintiff Coston and his co-plaintiff, Derrick Harris (Coston v. Onondaga Cnty., No. 19-CV-1389 (N.D.N.Y. filed Oct. 31, 2019)). Dkt. No. #10 . On the same date, the Court received plaintiff Coston's application to proceed in the action in forma pauperis and his inmate authorization form. Dkt. Nos. #8 - #9 . Plaintiff Coston's requests for a copy of the docket sheet and "Docs. #1 - #3 " in this action are GRANTED. To the extent plaintiff Coston also requests leave to file an amended complaint in this action, it is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff Coston is referred to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 7.1 of the Local Rules of Practice for this Court, which govern the filing an amended complaint, as well as the circumstances under which plaintiffs may be required to seek leave of the Court before filing an amended complaint. The Clerk is respectfully directed to serve a copy of the docket sheet and courtesy copies of Dkt. Nos. #1 - #3 on plaintiff Coston. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/2/2020. (Copy of text order, docket sheet, and Dkt. Nos. 1-3 provided to the plaintiff Coston by regular mail and copy of text order provided to plaintiff Harris by regular mail). (sal) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter Motion from Rashod Coston. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Rashod Coston. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rashod Coston. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDkt. No. 4 and blank ifp and authorization form reserved on Coston at Elmira C.F. (nas, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Rashod Coston. Old Address: Onondaga County Justice Center. New Address: Elmira Correctional Facility. (Mailing envelope included) (meb) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #4 Order. Sent to Coston Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order) (nas, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; re: #4 Order. Sent to Harris Address sent to Onondaga County Justice Center. Envelope reads "return to sender". (Attachments: #1 order) (nas, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECISION AND ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE as to Plaintiffs Rashod Coston and Derrick Harris: Plaintiffs Coston and Harris must each individually, within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order, either (a) pay the Court's filing fee of $400.00 in full or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application in accordance with this Decision and Order and a signed inmate authorization form reflecting his individual consent to pay the $350.00 filing fee over time, in installments. If, within the time period specified above, Coston or Harris fails to comply with the terms of this Decision and Order delineated above, the non-compliant individual will be terminated from the docket and any claims asserted by that non-compliant individual will be dismissed from the action without prejudice without further Order of this Court. Upon full compliance with this Decision and Order, or at the expiration of the deadline to comply, whichever is earlier, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/13/2020. (Notice of Compliance Deadline 2/12/2020. Case Review Deadline 3/13/2020). (Copy of Decision and Order, a blank IFP application, and blank Inmate Authorization Form served upon Plaintiffs Rashod Coston and Derrick Harris via regular mail) (sal) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-11525. electronically transferred when case opened (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #2 Order, to Rashod Coston 11-0374 555 S. State Street Syracuse, NY 13202. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiffs should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/30/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cabrey, Carsten, Commission of Corrections, Eugene Conway, Cuomo, Fourth Dept. Appellate Division, Lorenzo, Miller, Okun, Onodaga County, Onondaga County Justice Center, Peterson, State of New York. Document filed by Rashod Coston.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.