This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2020 at 13:33:31 (UTC).

Costello v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Costello filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02566

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Costello

Defendant

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel Melvil Wheeler

Attorney at Smith Closser

7455 Cross Country Road, Suite 1

North Charleston, SC 29483

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Adams Abee

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Brian Montgomery Barnwell

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Costello.(Wheeler, Samuel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#17

(#17) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/30/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/4/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motions due by 5/3/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or 8/2/2021, Mediation Due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/24/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#16

(#16) First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#15

(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#14

(#14) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#12

(#12) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#11

(#11) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2020, Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Motions due by 3/3/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Brian Barnwell is relieved as counsel for SLS in this matter and SLS will continue to be represented by its other counsel of record who is also of Nelson Mullins. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/24/2020.(vdru, ) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order Exh. A - Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exh. A - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barnwell, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Costello.(Wheeler, Samuel) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal from Dorchester County Clerk

#5

(#5) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Dorchester County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal from Dorchester County Clerk)(Barnwell, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Barnwell, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(vdru, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-18-922. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207967), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Note, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Documents)(vdru, ). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Costello.(Wheeler, Samuel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/30/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/4/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2021, Discovery due by 4/5/2021, Motions due by 5/3/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or 8/2/2021, Mediation Due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/24/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2020, Discovery due by 2/1/2021, Motions due by 3/3/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Mediation Due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/6/2020. (vdru, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Brian Barnwell is relieved as counsel for SLS in this matter and SLS will continue to be represented by its other counsel of record who is also of Nelson Mullins. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/24/2020.(vdru, ) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exh. A - Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barnwell, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael Costello.(Wheeler, Samuel) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Dorchester County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal from Dorchester County Clerk)(Barnwell, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(Barnwell, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.(vdru, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-18-922. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9207967), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Note, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Documents)(vdru, ). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less