This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2019 at 08:21:14 (UTC).

Coscarelli v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Coscarelli filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Xavier Rodriguez and Elizabeth S. Chestney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01219

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teri Jan Coscarelli

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Aaron Zendeh Del

Attorney at The Zendeh Del Law Firm PLLC

7600 San Jacinto Place, Suite 200

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY -IT WAS ENTERED IN THE WRONG CASE***ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rf) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mgr). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teri Jan Coscarelli. All Defendants served 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019 (Zendeh Del, Jason) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL TO PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. IT WAS DOCKETED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR*** re #6 Order. (rf) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY -IT WAS ENTERED IN THE WRONG CASE***ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rf) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mgr). (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul and U.S. Attorney General (bc) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Teri Jan Coscarelli. for U.S. Atty General and Andrew Saul c/o OGC (Zendeh Del, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Teri Jan Coscarelli. (Zendeh Del, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12718979). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Teri Jan Coscarelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zendeh Del, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.