This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2020 at 10:10:23 (UTC).

Cosby v. United States Government et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Cosby filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against United States Government. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. Friot. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. Friot

 

Party Details

Defendants

Joe M Allbaugh

Kelly Collins

Ricky Adams

Cherokee Nation

Core Civic

Nicholas Southerland

Oklahoma Attorney General's Office

Raymond Byrd

FNU Benavides

Jimmy Harmon

Public Defender Office

Oklahoma City Police Department

Oklahoma County Courthouse

Office of the Governor

Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office

Mary Fallin

Nancy Nagel

David Prator

Oklahoma County District Attorney's Office

John Wetsel

13 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Envelope

12 #1

Attachment 1 - Inmate Offender Grievance Requests

#12

#11

#8

1 #13

Attachment 13- Open Records Act Request

1 #12

Attachment 12- Inmate Credits

1 #11

Attachment 11- Letter from Public Defender

1 #10

Attachment 10- Receipt

1 #9

Attachment 9- Mailing Documents

1 #8

Attachment 8- Mailing Documents

1 #7

Attachment 7- Mailing Documents

1 #6

Attachment 6- Mailing Documents

1 #5

Attachment 5- Letter to Public Defender

1 #4

Attachment 4- Letter to Rick Warren

1 #3

Attachment 3- Letter to P.D. Taylor

1 #2

Attachment 2- Opinion

1 #1

Attachment 1- Opinion

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE (other) by Samuel Cosby re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Offender Grievance Requests, #2 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Cosby. The undersigned recommends the dismissal of Plaintiff's action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), without prejudice to refiling. The undersigned further recommends the denial of #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Samuel Cosby. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2020. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues before the court and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/22/20. (lb) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE (other) tiled "Evidence List" by Samuel Cosby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Grievance Restriction Warning, #2 Exhibit 2 - Inmate Grievance Requests and Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grievance 19-319 Receipt, #4 Exhibit 4 - Grievance Requests 19-311-2, #5 Exhibit 5 - Grievance Requests 19-307-2, #6 Exhibit 6 - Grievance Requests 19-308-2, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sept 18 2019 Legal Library Cancelled, #8 Exhibit 9 - Request to Staffs Answered Prior to Inmate Request, #9 Exhibit 10 - Denied Request for Study of Information, #10 Exhibit 11 - Denied State Farm Attorney Address, #11 Exhibit 12 - Kosher Diet During Lock Down, #12 Exhibit 13 - Attorney General Response to Mitigating Evidence, #13 Exhibit 14 - Motion, Response, Order re Post-Conviction Relief, #14 Envelope)(knt) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Samuel Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting in part #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $71.57 on or before 5/18/20. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments until he has paid the total filing fee of $350. The Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 4/27/20. (lb) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Cosby. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER to Cure Deficiency on or before 4/27/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 4/6/20. (lb) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Joe Heaton no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joe Heaton on 3/30/2020. (rb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell.Entered at the Direction of the Honorable Joe Heaton on 3/30/2020. (rb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Samuel Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PREVIOUS Cases (rb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Samuel Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Opinion, #2 Attachment 2- Opinion, #3 Attachment 3- Letter to P.D. Taylor, #4 Attachment 4- Letter to Rick Warren, #5 Attachment 5- Letter to Public Defender, #6 Attachment 6- Mailing Documents, #7 Attachment 7- Mailing Documents, #8 Attachment 8- Mailing Documents, #9 Attachment 9- Mailing Documents, #10 Attachment 10- Receipt, #11 Attachment 11- Letter from Public Defender, #12 Attachment 12- Inmate Credits, #13 Attachment 13- Open Records Act Request, #14 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less