This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 07:53:40 (UTC).

Cosby v. State of Illinois Court of Claims et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Cosby filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Illinois Court of Claims. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-50196

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Cosby

Dixon, IL 61021

Defendants

Judge

State of Illinois Court of Claims

Illinois Parole Board

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Allen Cosby. (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmark 08/07/19)(lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 9/12/2019:Mailed notice(sb, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Allen Cosby for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

1 #1

Envelope postmark 8/07/19

#5

(#5) ORDER:The court denies plaintiff=s application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and summarily dismisses the complaint with prejudice in view of plaintiff=s failure to advise the court that he had struck out. The case is terminated. Having brought this action, plaintiff nevertheless remains obligated to pay the full filing fee. Before pursuing any future litigation, plaintiff must pay any outstanding fees. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/12/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff(pg, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT seeking strongly to be granted to proceed by Plaintiff Allen Cosby. (lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 9/12/2019:Mailed notice(sb, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (pg, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER:The court denies plaintiff=s application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and summarily dismisses the complaint with prejudice in view of plaintiff=s failure to advise the court that he had struck out. The case is terminated. Having brought this action, plaintiff nevertheless remains obligated to pay the full filing fee. Before pursuing any future litigation, plaintiff must pay any outstanding fees. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 9/12/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff(pg, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT seeking strongly to be granted to proceed by Plaintiff Allen Cosby. (lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Allen Cosby for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Allen Cosby. (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmark 08/07/19)(lma, ) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.