This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2021 at 10:45:01 (UTC).

Cosby v. Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Cosby filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00603

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harold Cosby

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collin Joseph Earl

Attorney at Earl & Earl PLLC-Colorado Springs

1259 Lake Plaza Drive, Suite 230

Colorado Springs, CO 80906

Defendant Attorney

Karen Hannah Wheeler

Attorney at Wheeler Law PC

5690 Dtc Boulevard, Suite 240E

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Harold Cosby. (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Harold Cosby (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#12

(#12) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 April 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #11 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Harold Cosby All parties do not consent.. (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wheeler, Karen) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#9

(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 March 2021. For good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #8 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative complaint on or before April 9, 2021.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company. (Wheeler, Karen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Cosby. Geico General Insurance Company served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#6

(#6) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 March 2021. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #5 ). In light of the information provided by Plaintiff, this Court's Order (ECF #4 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 4/21/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due5/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2_CSOS GEICO

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1_Voter Registration

#5

(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 by Plaintiff Harold Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1_Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2_CSOS GEICO)(Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 March 2021. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before March 16, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not dismiss this case (or recommend that it be dismissed) without prejudice for the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #6 on 3/4/2021 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 UIM information

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GEICO General Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7741086)Attorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Harold Cosby(pty:pla), filed by Harold Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 UIM information, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Harold Cosby. (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Harold Cosby (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#16) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Collin Joseph Earl was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/23/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/23/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00603-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 April 2021. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #11 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Harold Cosby All parties do not consent.. (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Geico General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wheeler, Karen) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 March 2021. For good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #8 is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the operative complaint on or before April 9, 2021.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company. (Wheeler, Karen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold Cosby. Geico General Insurance Company served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4 March 2021. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #5 ). In light of the information provided by Plaintiff, this Court's Order (ECF #4 ) is discharged. Consent Form due by 4/21/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due5/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 by Plaintiff Harold Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1_Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2_CSOS GEICO)(Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 March 2021. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before March 16, 2021, demonstrating why the Court should not dismiss this case (or recommend that it be dismissed) without prejudice for the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF #6 on 3/4/2021 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GEICO General Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7741086)Attorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Harold Cosby(pty:pla), filed by Harold Cosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 UIM information, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Hannah Wheeler