This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 09:20:40 (UTC).

Cortina v. Anthem Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Cortina filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Anthem Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21375

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brianna Tiffany Cortina

Defendant

Anthem Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Saul Remer

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

44 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Daniel H. Hunt

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre PLLC

44 West Flagler St., Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorney

Angelique Groza Lyons

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP

Po Box 1840

Tampa, FL 33601-1840

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case by Brianna Tiffany Cortina. (Remer, Jason) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#9

(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anthem Inc., filed by Brianna Tiffany Cortina.(Remer, Jason) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT - Removal Status Report by Anthem Inc. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anthem Inc. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anthem Inc.. Responses due by 4/30/2021 (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H. Hunt on behalf of Brianna Tiffany Cortina (Hunt, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case by Brianna Tiffany Cortina. (Remer, Jason) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anthem Inc., filed by Brianna Tiffany Cortina.(Remer, Jason) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT - Removal Status Report by Anthem Inc. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anthem Inc. (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anthem Inc.. Responses due by 4/30/2021 (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H. Hunt on behalf of Brianna Tiffany Cortina (Hunt, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14594242, filed by Anthem Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons served)(Lyons, Angelique) Text Modified on 4/9/2021 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anthem, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angelique Groza Lyons