This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:48:38 (UTC).

Cortes v. HLee Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Cortes filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against HLee Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02275

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Cortes

Defendants

HLee Corporation

S&J Lee Corporation

Simon Lee Lee

Jung Jin Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Eric Oliphant

Attorney at THE CRONE LAW FIRM

88 Union Avenue, 14Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 6/30/2022. (shl) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#16

(#16) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 5/30/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 5/19/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2023. (jam) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Victor Cortes of Service of Initial Disclosures (Oliphant, Philip) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Oliphant, Philip) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HLee Corporation, Jung Jin Lee, Simon Lee Lee, S&J Lee Corporation. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/25/2022. (shl) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond (proposed order submitted) by All Defendants. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#8

(#8) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, June 30, 2022 at 2:00 P.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.(smm) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Defendants (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

6 #3

Summons

6 #1

Summons

1 #5

Summons Simon Lee

1 #4

Summons S&J Lee Corporation

1 #3

Summons Jung Jin Lee

1 #2

Summons HLee Corp

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 6/30/2022. (shl) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 5/30/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 5/19/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2023. (jam) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#15) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Microsoft Teams Scheduling Conference held on 6/30/2022. Philip E. Oliphant appeared for the Plaintiff. Joseph R. Bryant appeared for the Defense. Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 5/30/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 5/19/2023 at 10:00 AM. Proposed Pretrial Order Order due by 5/12/2023. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Cathy Phillips) (jam) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Victor Cortes of Service of Initial Disclosures (Oliphant, Philip) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Oliphant, Philip) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HLee Corporation, Jung Jin Lee, Simon Lee Lee, S&J Lee Corporation. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/25/2022. (shl) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond (proposed order submitted) by All Defendants. (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, June 30, 2022 at 2:00 P.M. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions.(smm) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Defendants (Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(btg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (btg) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3867541), filed by Victor Cortes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons HLee Corp, #3 Summons Jung Jin Lee, #4 Summons S&J Lee Corporation, #5 Summons Simon Lee)(Oliphant, Philip) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Russ Bryant